EP1804064 - Diagnostics and therapeutics for macular degeneration [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION 214 Technology Innovation Center, Oakdale Research Campus Iowa City, IA 52242 / US | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hageman, Gregory S. 500 Auburn Hills Drive Coralville, IA 52241 / US | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Naylor, Kathryn May, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06019641.7 | 22.02.2000 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US19990120822P | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 120822 P | US19990120668P | 19.02.1999 Original published format: US 120668 P | US19990123052P | 05.03.1999 Original published format: US 123052 P | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1804064 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (EP);
C12Q2600/156 (EP);
C12Q2600/158 (EP);
G01N2333/78 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | 20.10.2006 | LT | 20.10.2006 | LV | 20.10.2006 | MK | 20.10.2006 | RO | 20.10.2006 | SI | 20.10.2006 | Title | German: | Diagnostika und Therapeutika für Makuladegeneration | [2007/27] | English: | Diagnostics and therapeutics for macular degeneration | [2007/27] | French: | Diagnostics et thérapeutiques pour la dégénérescence maculaire | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00915845.2 / EP1153302 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 17.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9517673 (OCUTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16,42 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 35 * * page 5, line 9 - page 7, line 2; examples 1-11 * * abstract * | [X] - VINGERLING, J.R. ET AL., "Age-related macular degeneration and smoking. The Rotterdam study", ARCH OPHTHALMOL, (199610), vol. 114, no. 10, pages 1193 - 1196, XP000861808 [X] 1-16,42 * abstract * | [X] - SACKS J G ET AL, "The pathogenesis of optic nerve drusen. A hypothesis.", ARCHIVES OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1977 MAR) 95 (3) 425-8., (199703), XP000911974 [X] 1-16,42 * abstract * | [X] - CUNNINGHAM R D ET AL, "Aneurysm of the ophthalmic artery with drusen of the optic nerve head.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1971 OCT) 72 (4) 743-5., (197110), XP000911948 [X] 1-16,42 * abstract * | [X] - TARKKANEN, A. AND LAATIKAINEN, L., "late ocular manifestations in neonatal herpes simplex infection", BR J OPHTHALOML, (1977), vol. 61, pages 608 - 616, XP000911789 [X] 1-16,42 * abstract * | by applicant | US5259045 | WO9215694 | US4833080 | US5176996 | US5264564 | US5256775 | US4683195 | - ALLIKMETS, R., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 1805 - 1807 | - ANDERSON, K. L., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 55, page 1477 | - CREMERS, F. P. M., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1998), vol. 7, pages 355 - 362 | - GERBER, S., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 56, pages 396 - 399 | - GERBER, S., GENOMICS, (1998), vol. 48, pages 139 - 142 | - KAPLAN, J., NAT. GENET., (1993), vol. 5, pages 308 - 311 | - KAPLAN, J., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 55, page 190 | - MARTINEZ- MIR, A., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 40, pages 142 - 146 | - NASONKIN, I., HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 102, pages 21 - 26 | - STONE, E. M., NAT. GENET., (1998), vol. 20, pages 328 - 329 | - KLEIN, M. L., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., (1988), vol. 116, pages 1082 - 1088 | - EDWARDS, A. O., AM. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1998), vol. 126, pages 417 - 424 | - HEON, E., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., (1996), vol. 114, pages 193 - 198 | - HEON, E., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL VIS. SCI., (1996), vol. 37, page 1124 | - GREGORY, C. Y., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1996), vol. 7, pages 1055 - 1059 | - FELBOR, U., HUM. MUTAT., (1997), vol. 10, pages 301 - 309 | - PAYNE, A.. M., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 61, page A290 | - PAYNE, A.. M., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1998), vol. 7, pages 273 - 277 | - SOKOL, I., MOL. CELL, (1998), vol. 2, pages 129 - 133 | - KELSELL, R. E., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 63, pages 274 - 279 | - GRIESINGER, I. B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 63, page A30 | - STONE, E.M., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 112, pages 765 - 772 | - KELSELL, R. E., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1995), vol. 4, pages 653 - 656 | - ROBB, M. F., AM. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1998), vol. 125, pages 502 - 508 | - SAUER, C. G., J. MED. GENET., (1997), vol. 34, pages 961 - 966 | - SMALL, K. W., GENOMICS, (1992), vol. 13, pages 681 - 685 | - SMALL, K. W., MOL. VIS., (1997), vol. 3, page 1 | - INGLEHEARN, C. F., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 55, pages 581 - 582 | - KREMER, H., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1994), vol. 3, pages 299 - 302 | - FITZGIBBON, J., HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 93, pages 79 - 80 | - NATHANS, J., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 193, pages 193 - 232 | - NATHANS, J., ANN. REV. GENET., (1992), vol. 26, pages 403 - 424 | - NATHANS, J., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1993), vol. 53, pages 987 - 1000 | - WEITZ, C. J., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1992), vol. 50, pages 498 - 507 | - WEITZ, C. J., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1992), vol. 51, pages 444 - 446 | - FERRELL, R. E., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1983), vol. 35, pages 78 - 84 | - LEACH, R. J., CYTOGENET. CELL GENET., (1996), vol. 75, pages 71 - 84 | - SOHOCKI, M. M., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 61, pages 239 - 241 | - FORSMAN, K., CLIN. GENET., (1992), vol. 42, pages 156 - 159 | - GRAFF, C., GENOMICS, (1994), vol. 24, pages 425 - 434 | - PETRUKHIN, K., NAT. GENET., (1998), vol. 19, pages 241 - 247 | - MARQUARDT, A., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1998), vol. 7, pages 1517 - 1525 | - NICHOLS, B. E., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 54, pages 95 - 103 | - STONE, E. M., NAT. GENET., (1992), vol. 1, pages 246 - 250 | - WADEILUS, C., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1993), vol. 53, page 1718 | - WEB ER, B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1993), vol. 5 3, page 1099 | - WEB ER, B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 55, pages 1182 - 1187 | - WEB ER, B. H., GENOMICS, (1994), vol. 20, pages 267 - 274 | - ZHAUNG, Z., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1993), vol. 53, page 1112 | - ZHANG, F., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 112, pages 759 - 764 | - CELL, (1995), vol. 82, pages 949 - 957 | - EIBERG, H., CLIN. GENET., (1989), vol. 36, pages 217 - 218 | - GARDINER, M., GENOMICS, (1990), vol. 8, pages 387 - 390 | - MITCHISON, H. M., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 57, pages 312 - 315 | - MITCHISON, H. M., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 56, pages 654 - 662 | - MITCHISON, H. M., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 40, pages 346 - 350 | - MUNROE , P. B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 61, pages 310 - 316 | - LOTERY, A. J., OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1996), vol. 37, page 1124 | - BALCIUNIENE, J., GENOMICS, (1995), vol. 30, pages 281 - 286 | - SMALL, K. W., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 57, page A203 | - SMALL, K. W., AM. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1996), vol. 121, pages 13 - 18 | - KLYSTRA, J. A., CAN. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1993), vol. 28, pages 79 - 80 | - MANHANT, S., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1995), vol. 57, page A96 | - WARBURG, M., AM. J. MED. GENET., (1991), vol. 39, pages 288 - 293 | - EVANS, K., NAT. GENET., (1994), vol. 6, pages 210 - 213 | - EVANS, K., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL., (1995), vol. 113, pages 195 - 201 | - FREUND, C. L., CELL, (1997), vol. 91, pages 543 - 553 | - FREUND, C. L., NAT. GENET., (1998), vol. 18, pages 311 - 312 | - GREGORY, C. Y., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1994), vol. 55, pages 1061 - 1063 | - LI, X., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI USA, (1998), vol. 95, pages 1876 - 1881 | - SOHOCKI, M. M., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 63, pages 1307 - 1315 | - SWAIN, P. K., NEURON, (1987), vol. 19, pages 1329 - 1336 | - FELBOR, U., HUM. MOL. GENET., (1995), vol. 4, pages 2415 - 2416 | - FELBOR, U., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1997), vol. 60, pages 57 - 62 | - JACOBSON, S. E., NAT. GENET., (1995), vol. 11, pages 27 - 32 | - PETERS, A., RETINA, (1995), vol. 15, pages 480 - 485 | - STÖHR, H., GENOME RES., (1995), vol. 5, pages 483 - 487 | - WEB ER, B. H. F., NAT. GENET., (1994), vol. 8, pages 352 - 355 | - WEB ER, B. H. F., NAT. GENET., (1994), vol. 7, pages 158 - 161 | - WIJESVRIYA, S. D., GENOME RES., (1996), vol. 6, pages 92 - 101 | - BARTLEY, J., CYTOGENET. CELL . GENET., (1989), vol. 51, page 959 | - BERGEN, A. A. B., GENOMICS, (1993), vol. 18, pages 463 - 464 | - DASH-MODI, A., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1996), vol. 37, page 998 | - HONG, H.-K., AM. J. HUM. GENET, (1994), vol. 55, pages 1173 - 1181 | - MEIRE, F. M., BR. J. OPHTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 78, pages 103 - 108 | - SEYMOUR, A. B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1998), vol. 62, pages 122 - 129 | - BAXTER BT, "Abdominal aortic aneurysms are associated with altered matrix proteins of nonaneurysmal aortic segments", J VASC SURG, (199405), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 797 - 802 | - GAETANI P, "Metalloproteases and intracranial vascular lesions", NEUROL RES, (199906), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 385 - 90 | - HALLORAN BG, "Localization of aortic disease is associated with intrinsic differences in aor", J SURG RES, (199507), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 17 - 22 | - BEST F. Z., AUGENHEILKD., (1905), vol. 13, pages 199 - 212 | - SORSBY, A., BR J. OPTHALMOL., (1949), vol. 33, pages 67 - 97 | - STARGARDT, K., ALBRECHT VON GRAEFES ARCH KLIN EXP OPTHALMOL., (1909), vol. 71, pages 534 - 550 | - FERRELL, R. E., AM J. HUM GENET., (1983), vol. 35, pages 78 - 84 | - JACOBSON, D. M., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 96, pages 885 - 895 | - STONE, E. M., NATURE GENET., (1992), vol. 1, pages 246 - 250 | - FORSMAN, K., CLIN GENET., (1992), vol. 42, pages 156 - 159 | - KAPLAN, J. S., NATURE GENET., (1993), vol. 5, pages 308 - 311 | - STONE, E. M., ARCH OPTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 112, pages 763 - 772 | - ZHANG, K., ARCH OPTHALMOL., (1994), vol. 112, pages 759 - 764 | - EVANS, K., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 6, pages 210 - 213 | - KREMER, H., HUM MOL GENET., (1994), vol. 3, pages 299 - 302 | - KELSELL, R. E., HUM MOL GENET., (1995), vol. 4, pages 1653 - 1656 | - NATHANS, J., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 245, pages 831 - 838 | - WELLS, J., NATURE GENET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 213 - 218 | - NICHOLS, B. E., NATURE GENET., (1993), vol. 3, pages 202 - 207 | - WEB ER, B. H. F., NATURE GENET., (1994), vol. 8, pages 352 - 355 | - MAINSTER, M.A., LIGHT AND MACULAR DEGENERATION: A BIOPHYSICAL AND CLINICAL PERSPECTIVE, (1987), vol. 1, pages 304 - 10 | - MACSWEENEY, BRIT J. SURG., (1994), vol. 81, pages 935 - 941 | - WILMINK, A.B.; QUICK, C.R., BRIT. J. SUR., (1998), vol. 85, pages 152 - 162 | - CRAWFORD ES, "Thoracoabdominal aortic aneurysms: preoperative and intraoperative factors determining immediate and long-term results of operations in 605 patients", J. VASC. SURG., (1986), vol. 3, pages 389 - 404 | - PANNETON JM, "Nondissecting thoracoabdominal aortic aneurysms: Part I", VASC. SURG., (1995), vol. 9, pages 503 - 514 | - CLARK JM, "Transmural organization of the arterial media: the lamellar unit revisited", ARTERIOSCLEROSIS, (1985), vol. 5, page 19 | - VERLOES, A., J. VASC. SURG., (1995), vol. 21, pages 646 - 655 | - KOJIMA M, "Asymptomatic familial cerebral aneurysms", NEUROSURGERY, (199810), vol. 43, no. 4, pages 776 - 81 | - RASMUSSEN TE, "Genetic risk factors in inflammatory abdominal aneurysms: polymorphic residue 70 in the HLA-DR B1 gene as a key genetic element", J VASC SURG, (199702), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 356 - 64 | - POWELL JT, "Interaction between fibrillin genotype and blood pressure and the develop aneurysmal disease", ANN NY ACAD SCI, (19961118), vol. 800, pages 198 - 207 | - KUIVANIEMI, EUR. J. HUM. GEN, (1999), vol. 6, pages 642 - 646 | - KONTUSAARI, S., ANN. N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1990), vol. 580, pages 556 - 557 | - TROMP, G., J. CLIN. INVEST., vol. 91, pages 2539 - 2545 | - KUIVANIEMI, H., J. CLIN. INVEST., (1991), vol. 88, pages 1441 - 1444 | - COHEN, J. R., J. SURG. RES., (1990), vol. 49, pages 319 - 321 | - NORRGARD, O., HUM. HERED., (1984), vol. 34, pages 166 - 169 | - ROBERT L, "Elastin-elastase-atherosclerosis revisited", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (199810), vol. 140, no. 2, pages 281 - 95 | - NICHOLLS SC, "Rupture in small abdominal aortic aneurysms", J VASC SURG, (199811), vol. 28, no. 5, pages 884 - 8 | - THOMPSON, RW, CURRENT OPINION CARDIOLOGY, (1996), vol. 11, pages 504 - 518 | - CENACCHI G, "The morphology of elastin in non-specific and inflammatory abdominal as aneurysms. A comparative transmission, scanning and immunoelectronmicroscopy study", J SUBMISCROSC CYTOL PATHOL, (199501), vol. 27, no. 1, pages 75 - 81 | - ANIDJAR S, "Experimental study of determinants of aneurysmal expansion of the abdomen", ANN VASC SURG, (199403), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 127 - 36 | - CAMPA, JS, ATHERSCLEROSIS, (1987), vol. 65, pages 13 - 21 | - WHITE JV, "Adventitial elastolysis is a primary event in aneurysm formation", J VASC SURG, vol. 17, no. 2, pages 371 - 80 | - HE CM, "The composition and mechanical properties of abdominal aortic aneurysm", J VASC SURG, (199407), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 6 - 13 | - SAUVAGE M, "Localization of elastin mRNA and TGF-beta in rat aorta and caudal artery as a function of age", CELL TISSUE RES., (1998), vol. 29, pages 305 - 314 | - KAHARI VM, "TGF-beta up-regulates elastin gene expression in human skin fibroblasts: evidence for post-transcriptional modulation", LAB INVEST, (1992), vol. 66, pages 580 - 8 | - ROBERT L, "Elastin-elastase atherosclerosis revisited", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1998), vol. 140, pages 281 - 295 | - VARGA Z, "Age-dependent changes of K-elastin stimulated effector functions of human phagocytic cells: relevance for atherogenesis", EXP GERONTOL, (1997), vol. 32, pages 653 - 62 | - STRAUSS BH, "Extracellular matrix remodeling after balloon angioplasty injury in a rabbit model of restenosis", CIRC RES, (1994), vol. 75, pages 650 - 8 | - AOYAGI M, "Smooth muscle cell proliferation, elastin formation, and tropoelastin transcripts during the development of intimal thickening in rabbit carotid arteries after endothelial denudation", HISTOCHEM CELL BIOL, (1997), vol. 107, page 117 | - MINION DJ, "Elastin is increased in abdominal aortic aneurysms", J SURG RES, (199410), vol. 57, no. 4, pages 443 - 6 | - SENIOR, R. M., J. CELL BIOL., (1984), vol. 99, pages 870 - 874 | - CURCI JA, "Expression and localization of macrophage elastase matrix metalloprotein abdominal aortic aneurysms", J CLIN INVEST, (19981201), vol. 102, no. 11, pages 1900 - 10 | - BROPHY, CM, J SURG RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 50, pages 653 - 657 | - VINE; POWELL, CLINICAL SCI., (1991), vol. 81, pages 233 - 239 | - BUCKMASTER MJ, "Source of elastin- degrading enzymes in mycotic aortic aneurysms: bacterial or inflammatory response?", CARDIOVASC SURG, (199901), vol. 71, pages 16 - 26 | - SAKALIHASAN N, "Activated forms of MMP2 and MMP9 in abdominal aortic aneurysms", J VASC SURG, (199607), vol. 24, no. 1, pages 127 - 33 | - DAVIS V, "Matrix metalloproteinase-2 production and its binding to the matrix are in abdominal aortic aneurysms", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (199810), vol. 18, no. 10, pages 1625 - 33 | - ALLAIRE E, "Local overexpression of TIMP-1 prevents aortic aneurysm degeneration an a rat model", J CLIN INVEST, (19981001), vol. 102, no. 7, pages 1413 - 20 | - NIKKARI ST, "Macrophages contain 92-kd gelatinase (MMP-9) at the site of degenerated elastic lamina in temporal arteritis", AM J PATHOL, (199611), vol. 149, no. 5, pages 1427 - 33 | - COHEN JR, ANNALS VASCULAR SURGERY, (1990), vol. 4, pages 570 - 574 | - CATTELL MA, "Increased elastin content and decreased elastin concentration may be predictive factors in dissecting aneurysms of human thoracic aorta", CARDIOVASC RES, (199302), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 176 - 81 | - TAMARINA NA, "Expression of matrix metalloproteinases and their inhibitors in aneurysms of the aorta", SURGERY, (199708), vol. 122, no. 2, pages 264 - 71 | - ELMORE JR, "Expression of matrix metalloproteinases and TIMPs in human abdominal aneurysms", ANN VASC SURG, (199805), vol. 12, no. 3, pages 221 - 8 | - HALLORAN, B. G.; BAXTER, B. T., SEM. VASC. SURG., (1995), vol. 8, pages 85 - 92 | - MENASHI, S., J. VASC. SURG., (1987), pages 578 - 582 | - SOBOLEWSKI, K., ACT. BIOCIM. POLONICA, (1995), vol. 42, pages 301 - 308 | - DOBRIN, P. B.; MRKVICKA, R., CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, (1994), vol. 2, pages 484 - 488 | - TAMARINANA, J. SURG. RESEARCH, (1998), vol. 74, pages 76 - 80 | - HOLMANS, DR, GAY VASC. SURG, (1995), vol. 21, pages 761 - 772 | - THOMPSON MM, "Angiogenesis in abdominal aortic aneurysms", EUR J VASC ENDOVASC SURG, (199605), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 464 - 9 | - PAIK DC, "The nitrite/elastin reaction: implications for in vivo degenerative effects", CONNECT TISSUE RES, (1997), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 241 - 51 | - COHEN, JR, J SURG RESEARCH, (1990), vol. 49, pages 319 - 321 | - GRANGE, J. J., CARDIOVASC. SURG., (1997), vol. 5, pages 256 - 265 | - DI MARZO, "Inflammatory aneurysm of the abdominal aorta. A prospective clinical study", J CARDIOVASC SURG (TORINO, (199906), vol. 40, no. 3, pages 407 - 12 | - GARGIULO M, "Content and turnover of extracellular matrix protein in human ''nonspecific'' inflammatory abdominal aortic aneurysms", EUR J VASC SURG, (1993), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 546 - 53 | - PEARCE, W. H.; KOCH, A. E., ANNALS N. Y. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 800, pages 175 - 185 | - "Uncommon arteriopathies", JOYCE JW, VASCULAR SURGERY, WB SAUNDERS, (1989), pages 276 - 286 | - SEPPA H, "Platelet derived growth factor is a chemoattractant for fibroblasts", J. CELL BIOL, (1984), vol. 92, pages 584 - 588 | - GROTENDORST GR, "Platelet derived growth factor is a chemoattractant for vascular smooth muscle cells", J. CELL PHYSIOL, (1982), vol. 112, pages 261 - 266 | - GRANGE, J.J., CARDIO. VASC. SURG., (1997), vol. 5, pages 256 - 265 | - NEWMAN KM, "Matrix metalloproteinases in abdominal aortic aneurysm: characterization, purification, and their possible sources", CONNECT TISSUE RES, (1994), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 265 - 76 | - LEBERMANN, J., J. VASC. SURG., (1992), vol. 15, pages 569 - 572 | - FREESTONE T, "Inflammation and matrix metalloproteinases in the enlarging abdominal a aneurysm", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (199508), vol. 15, no. 8, pages 1145 - 51 | - BOBRYSHEV, Y.V., CARDIOVASCULAR SURGERY, (1998), vol. 6, no. 3, pages 240 - 249 | - COCH, AE, AM. J. PATH., (1990), vol. 137, pages 1199 - 1213 | - COCH, AE, AM . J. PATH., (1990), vol. 137, pages 1199 - 1213 | - BECKMAN, EN, AM . J. CLIN. PATHOL., (1986), vol. 85, pages 21 - 24 | - BALL, RY, ARC. PATHOL. LAB. MED., (1987), vol. 111, pages 1134 - 1140 | - BROPHY, CM, ANNALS VASC. SURG., (1991), vol. 5, pages 229 - 233 | - YARDLEY, ARCH. PATHOL. LAB. MED., (1987), vol. 111, pages 1134 - 1140 | - KOSIERKIEWICZ, TA, SURG. FORUM, (1995), vol. 46, pages 365 - 367 | - HIROSE, H., J. VASC. SURG., (1998), vol. 27, pages 500 - 503 | - RASMUSSEN, T.E., J. VASC. SURG., (1997), vol. 25, pages 356 - 364 | - AAA, CAPELLA, J. SURG. RESEARCH, (1996), vol. 65, pages 31 - 33 | - PASQUINELLI G, "An immunohistochemical study of inflammatory abdominal aortic aneury", J SUBMISCROSC CYTOL PATHOL, (199301), vol. 25, no. 1, pages 103 - 12 | - WALTON, L.J., ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (1997), vol. 135, pages 65 - 71 | - TILSON, MD, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RESEARCH COMMUNICATION, (1995), vol. 213, pages 40 - 43 | - XIA, S, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RESEARCH COMMUNICATION, (1996), vol. 219, pages 36 - 39 | - GREGORY AK, ARC SURG, (1996), vol. 131, pages 85 - 88 | - TILSON, J. VASC. SURG., (1997), vol. 26, pages 313 - 318 | - OZSVATH, K., ANNALS NY ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 800, pages 288 - 293 | - HIROSE, H., J. VASC. SURG., (1997), vol. 26, pages 313 - 318 | - KEEN RR, "Interleukin-1 beta induces differential gene expression in aortic smooth muscle", J VASC SURG, (199411), vol. 20, no. 5, pages 774 - 84 | - DAVIS, C., J. VASC. SURG., (1992), vol. 16, pages 474 - 475 A | - REILLY, J. M., ANNALS NYACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 800, pages 151 - 156 | - GRANGE JJ, "Pathogenesis of abdominal aortic aneurysm: an update and look toward the future", CARDIOVASC SURG, (199706), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 256 - 65 | - TRENTHAM, D.E., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 261, pages 1727 - 1730 | - RICCI MA, "Anti-CD 18 monoclonal antibody slows experimental aortic aneurysm expansion", J VASC SURG, (199602), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 301 - 7 | - THOMPSON, R.W.; W.C. PARKS, ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1996), vol. 800, pages 157 - 174 | - THOMPSON RW, "MMP inhibition in abdominal aortic aneurysms. Rationale for a prospective randomized clinical trial", ANN NY ACAD SCI, (19990630), vol. 878, pages 159 - 78 | - MOORE G, "Suppression of experimental abdominal aortic aneurysms by systemic treatment with hydroxamate-based matrix metalloproteinase inhibitor (RS 132908", J VASE SURG, (199903), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 522 - 32 | - BIGATEL DA, "The matrix metalloproteinase inhibitor BB-94 limits expansion of experimental abdominal aortic aneurysms", J VASE SURG, (199901), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 130 - 8 | - BOYLE JR, "Amlodipine potentiates metalloproteinase activity and accelerates elastin degradation in a model of aneurysmal disease", EUR J VASE ENDOVASC SURG, (199811), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 408 - 14 | - THOMPSON RW, "Basic science of abdominal aortic aneurysms: emerging therapeutic strategies for an unresolved clinical problem", CURR OPIN CARDIOL, (199609), vol. 11, no. 5, pages 504 - 18 | - BOYLE JR, "Doxycycline inhibits elastin degradation and reduces metalloproteinase activity in a model of aneurysmal disease", J VASC SURG, (199802), vol. 27, no. 2, pages 354 - 61 | - CURCI JA, "Pharmacologic suppression of experimental abdominal aortic aneurysms: trial of doxycycline and four chemically modified tetracyclines", J VASC SURG, (199812), vol. 28, no. 6, pages 1082 - 93 | - WALTON LJ, "Inhibition of prostaglandin E2 synthesis in abdominal aortic aneurysms: implications for smooth muscle cell viability, inflammatory processes, and the expansion of abdominal aortic aneurysms", CIRCULATION, (19990706), vol. 100, no. 1, pages 48 - 54 | - HOLMES DR, "Indomethacin prevents elastase-induced abdominal aortic aneurysms in the rat", J SURG RES, (199606), vol. 63, no. 1, pages 305 - 9 | - MIRALLES M, "Indomethacin inhibits expansion of experimental aortic aneurysms via inhibiting the cox2 isoform of cyclooxygenase", J VASC SURG, (199905), vol. 29, no. 5, pages 884 - 92 | - BROPHY, CM, J. SURG. RESEARCH, (1989), vol. 46, pages 330 - 332 | - DZAU VJ, "Diseases of the aorta", HARRISON'S PRINCIPLES OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, (1998), pages 1394 - 1398 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBAR, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE, MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES AND CANCER THERAPY, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - HABIG, J BIOL CHEM, (1974), vol. 249, page 7130 | - ELLISON, J BIOL CHEM, (1991), vol. 266, pages 21150 - 21157 | - HOLMQUIST, ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1979), vol. 95, page 540 | - MCCONNELL, SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, page 1906 | - MARTINEZ-MIR, A., GENOMICS, (1997), vol. 40, pages 142 - 146 | - "Center for Medical Genetics", JOHNS HOPKINS UNIVERSITY , AND NATIONAL CENTER FOR BIOTECHNOLOGY INFORMATION, NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, vol. 7, (1998), page 21, URL: http://www3.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/omim | - WEB ER, B., AM. J. HUM. GENET., (1993), vol. 53, page 1099 | - BATTEN DISEASE CONSORTIUM, CELL, (1995), vol. 82, pages 949 - 957 | - DOETSCHMAN, J. EMBRYOL. EXP. MOMFGFHOL., (1985), vol. 87, pages 27 - 45 | - IOFFE, PNAS, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7357 - 7361 | - BRADLEY, CURRENT TOPICS IN DEVEL. BIOL., (1986), vol. 20, pages 357 - 371 | - LAKSO, PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6232 - 6236 | - ORBAN, PNAS, (1992), vol. 89, pages 6861 - 6865 | - O'GORMAN, SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 251, pages 1351 - 1355 | - ABREMSKI, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1984), vol. 259, pages 1509 - 1514 | - BRINSTER, PNAS, (1985), vol. 82, pages 4438 - 4442 | - JAENICH, R., PNAS, (1976), vol. 73, pages 1260 - 1264 | - JAHNER, PNAS, (1985), vol. 82, pages 6927 - 6931 | - VAN DER PUTTEN, PNAS, (1985), vol. 82, pages 6148 - 6152 | - STEWART, EMBO J., (1987), vol. 6, pages 383 - 388 | - JAHNER, NATURE, (1982), vol. 298, pages 623 - 628 | - EVANS, NATURE, (1981), vol. 292, pages 154 - 156 | - BRADLEY, NATURE, (1984), vol. 309, pages 255 - 258 | - GOSSLER, PNAS, (1986), vol. 83, pages 9065 - 9069 | - ROBERTSON, NATURE, (1986), vol. 322, pages 445 - 448 | - JAENISCH, R., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1468 - 1474 | - DNA CLONING, (1985), vol. I AND II | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS , INC. | - METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, vol. 154 AND | - HANDBOOK OF EXPERIMENTAL IMMUNOLOGY, (1986), vol. I-IV | - ROSSNER, B., FUNDAMENTALS OF BIOSTATISTICS, DUXBURY PRESS, pages 370 - 377 | - GENES, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, (1998), vol. VI | - ROSSNER, B., FUNDAMENTALS OF BIOSTATISTICS, DUXBURY PRESS, (1995), pages 370 - 377 | - ANIDJAR, S., CIRCULATION, (1990), vol. 82, pages 973 - 981 | - RICCI, M. A., J. VASC. SURG., (1996), vol. 23, pages 301 - 307 | - J HISTOCHEM CYTOCHEM, (1999), vol. 47, pages 1533 - 9 | US19980183972 |