EP1806459 - Fire protection element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reuter, Martin Eifelstrasse 10 63584 Gruendau / DE | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Michael An der Mainbrücke 16 63456 Hanau / DE | [2007/28] | Application number, filing date | 06019668.0 | 20.09.2006 | [2007/28] | Priority number, date | DE20051045517 | 22.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005045517 | [2007/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806459 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/94, E04B2/74 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
E04B1/942 (EP);
B32B7/08 (EP,US);
B32B13/06 (EP);
B32B15/18 (EP);
B32B3/085 (EP);
E04B9/001 (EP);
E04B9/045 (EP);
E21D11/38 (EP);
B32B2307/306 (EP);
B32B2307/3065 (EP);
B32B2307/7265 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (EP);
E04B2/7411 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/12] |
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Brandschutzbauelement | [2007/28] | English: | Fire protection element | [2007/28] | French: | Elément pour la protection contre le feu | [2007/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/33] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4122203 (STAHL JOEL S) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]EP0316126 (ELKEM ROCKWOOL ELKEM A S & A S [NO]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0078547 (GREEN PEAKS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2004087413 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK], et al) [X] 1-4,8,10,12 * page 4, line 11 - line 18 * * page 5, line 12 - line 24 * |