EP1767360 - Method for cooling components subjected to high temperatures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Werner, Todd C. 1038 Park Street St. Petersburg Florida 33710 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
Werner, Todd C. 3360 Scherer Drive St. Petersburg Florida 33716 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019792.8 | 21.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | US20050162751 | 21.09.2005 Original published format: US 162751 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1767360 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1767360 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41F23/04, B41J11/00 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
B41F23/0443 (EP,US);
G07B2017/00596 (EP,US);
Y10S198/952 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | B41F23/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/32] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Kühlen von hohen Temperaturen ausgesetzten Komponenten | [2007/13] | English: | Method for cooling components subjected to high temperatures | [2007/13] | French: | Méthode pour refroidir des composants soumis à des températures élevées | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 19.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/13] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE10150041 (PLATSCH GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0023] - [0031] *; | [A]US2003019126 (GREIVE MARTIN [DE]); | [A]US6427594 (SECOR HOWARD CURTIS [US], et al); | [A]US3364584 (MOWRY HARRY E, et al) |