EP1905950 - Turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bergander, Katharina Osterwicker Steig 3 13503 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Bostanjoglo, Georg Dr. Odenwaldstrasse 17 12161 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Buchal, Tobias Dr. Blaumeisenweg 4 40489 Düsseldorf / DE | 04 /
Esser, Winfried Dr. Am geraden Weg 39 44805 Bochum / DE | 05 /
Goldschmidt, Dirk Dr. Hagebuttenweg 14 47445 Moers / DE | 06 /
Koch, Torsten Fürstenstrasse 58b 46145 Oberhausen / DE | 07 /
Küperkoch, Rudolf Rheinstrasse 163 45219 Essen / DE | 08 /
Mattheis, Thorsten Peisberg 1 45473 Mülheim / DE | 09 /
Münzer, Jan Schivelbeiner Strasse 4 10439 Berlin / DE | 10 /
Müsgen, Ralf Holsterhauser Strasse 92 45147 Essen / DE | 11 /
Oechsner, Matthias, Dr. Westkapeller Ring 16 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 12 /
Pickert, Ursula Mühlenfeld 38 45470 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 13 /
Vosberg, Volker, Dr. Dr.-Türk Strasse 2B 45476 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2008/14] | Application number, filing date | 06019819.9 | 21.09.2006 | [2008/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1905950 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
F04D29/322 (EP);
F01D25/12 (EP);
F01D5/147 (EP);
F05D2230/90 (EP);
F05D2240/81 (EP);
F05D2250/71 (EP);
F05D2260/202 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/50] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Laufschaufel für eine Turbine | [2008/14] | English: | Turbine blade | [2008/14] | French: | Aube de turbine | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/14] | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/14] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0314606 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [A] 10* the whole document *; | [X]EP0937863 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] *; | [X]EP0940561 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,11 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP0955449 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US6092991 (TOMITA YASUOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * figures 4,5 * * column 4, line 66 - column 5, line 61 *; | [X]US6120249 (HULTGREN KENT GORAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,11 * figures 4-10 * * column 4, line 46 - column 6, line 36 * |