EP1768210 - Additives for overcharge protection in electrochemical cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Air Products and Chemicals, Inc. 7201 Hamilton Boulevard Allentown, PA 18195-1501 / US | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zonghai, Chen 7323 Northgate Way 9 Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | 02 /
Khalil, Amine 6813 Penner Place Downers Grove, IL 60516 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019887.6 | 22.09.2006 | [2007/13] | Priority number, date | US20050720610P | 26.09.2005 Original published format: US 720610 P | US20060520564 | 14.09.2006 Original published format: US 520564 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768210 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1768210 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, H01M10/42, H01M10/0568 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0025 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/13] | H01M10/40, H01M6/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2007/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusatzstoffe zum Überladeschutz in elektrochemischen Zellen | [2007/13] | English: | Additives for overcharge protection in electrochemical cells | [2007/13] | French: | Additifs comme protection contre la surcharge dans les piles electrochimiques | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 11.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 21.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2006 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | CZ | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | ES | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | IT | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | IE | 22.09.2015 | LU | 22.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.09.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
IT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
CZ | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
ES | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6022643 (LEE HUNG SUI [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1513215 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [PX]EP1587158 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [PX]JP2006019070 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [PX] 1-22 * abstract *; | [PX]EP1679760 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [PX] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DX] - LEE,H.S. ET AL., "Synthesis of a Series of Fluorinated Boronate compounds and Their Use as Additives in Lithium Battery Electrolytes", J.ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (2004), vol. 151, no. 9, pages A1429 - A1435, XP002412004 [DX] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1149/1.1779407 | [X] - LEE,H.S. ET AL., "The Synthesis of a New Family of Boron-Based Anion Receptors and the Study of their Effect on Ion Pair Dissociation and Conductivity of Lithium Salts in Nonaqueous Solutions", J.ELECTROCHEM. SOC., (1998), vol. 145, no. 8, pages 2813 - 2818, XP002412305 [X] 1-22 * the whole document * | [Y] - MARCINEK M ET AL, "Model composite polymer electrolytes containing triphenylborane", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20050630), vol. 50, no. 19, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 3934 - 3941, XP004933870 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.electacta.2005.02.045 | [Y] - MCBREEN J ET AL, "New approaches to the design of polymer and liquid electrolytes for lithium batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200008), vol. 89, no. 2, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 163 - 167, XP004201946 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(00)00425-0 | [Y] - BLOMGREN G E, "Liquid electrolytes for lithium and lithium-ion batteries", JOURNAL OF POWER SOURCES, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20030601), vol. 119-121, ISSN 0378-7753, pages 326 - 329, XP004430190 [Y] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-7753(03)00147-2 |