EP1731997 - Data output system with a printer device and data output method adapted for a print test [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UBS Business Solutions AG Bahnhofstrasse 45 8001 Zürich / CH | [2017/39] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states UBS AG Bahnhofstrasse 45 8001 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Codispoti, Guiseppe Grossackerstrasse 35 8041 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Dubach, Ernst Mythenweg 1a 5620 Bremgarten / CH | [2006/50] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/50] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06019905.6 | 19.08.2004 | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1731997 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1731997 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06F3/121 (EP,US);
G06F3/1234 (EP,US);
G06F3/1256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Title | German: | Daten-Ausgabe-System mit Druckeinrichtung, und Daten-Ausgabe-Verfahren, insbesondere zur Durchführung eines Test-Drucks | [2006/50] | English: | Data output system with a printer device and data output method adapted for a print test | [2006/50] | French: | Système de sortie de données avec une imprimante et méthode de sortie de données adaptés pour un test d'impression | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 02.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.10.2017 | 09.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/09] | 11.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.10.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/09] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04019707.1 / EP1628201 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040019707) is 19.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2013 | 31.08.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2002063884 (BHOGAL KULVIR SINGH [US], et al) [Y] 10-13 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]EP1335319 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,16,17 * column 4, line 28 - line 53 ** column 12, line 43 - column 17, line 29 *; | [XY]US6685368 (BECKMAN ORHAN E [US]) [X] 1-9,14-18 * column 2, line 47 - column 4, line 21 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 65 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 10-13 | Examination | WO9815414 | JP2001325249 |