EP1902655 - Shower curtain rod assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ri Hua Hardware Industry Co., Ltd. No. 386, Donglai Rd. Chungwei Village Hemei Township Changhua County 508 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Ri Hua Hardware Industry Co., Ltd. No. 386, Donglai Rd. Chungwei Village Hemei Township Changhua County 308 / TW | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states You Da Metal International Develop Co., Ltd. 386, Donglai Road Chungwei Village Hemei Township Chang hua 508 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liao, Ying Feng You Da Metal Intern. Dev. Co., Ltd 386, Donglai Road Chungwei Village Hemei Township Changhua County 508 / TW | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2008/13] | Application number, filing date | 06019940.3 | 22.09.2006 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902655 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/38, A47H1/142 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A47K3/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | Gestängeanordnung für Duschvorhang | [2008/13] | English: | Shower curtain rod assembly | [2008/13] | French: | Ensemble de tringles pour rideau de douche | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 24.05.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 27.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE202006001094U (HUANG WEN FENG [TW]) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014]; figures 1,2,5 * [A] 5,6; | [A]WO0027267 (MOORE SEAN [US]) [A] 1 * page 8, line 16 - line 25; figures 3a,3b,4c * |