EP1770353 - Optical tomography system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toida, Masahiro Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020530.9 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | JP20050289122 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005289122 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770353 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1770353 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01B9/02, A61B5/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
A61B5/0073 (EP,US);
A61B5/0066 (EP,US);
G01B9/02003 (EP,US);
G01B9/02004 (EP,US);
G01B9/02048 (EP,US);
G01B9/02068 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/50] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur optischen Tomographie | [2007/14] | English: | Optical tomography system | [2007/14] | French: | Système optique de tomographie | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 10.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10332329 (YOSHIMURA TAKEAKI, et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0025] - [0036] * * figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1704814 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-4* page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 21; figures 7,8 *; | [A] - YUN S H ET AL, "Pulsed-source and swept-source spectral-domain optical coherence tomography with reduced motion artifacts", OPTICS EXPRESS, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, DC,, US, (200411), vol. 12, no. 23, ISSN 1094-4087, pages 5614 - 5624, XP002373645 [A] 3 * page 5618, line 23 - page 5620, line 3; figure 2b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OPEX.12.005614 |