EP1772728 - Method and system for testing electrochemical sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2007/15] | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | ||
For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F.HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dreibholz, Joerg Wilhelmstrasse 23 67122 Altrip / DE | 02 /
Saecker, Sylvia Taunusstrasse 12 64625 Bensheim / DE | 03 /
Unkrig, Volker Stahlbuehlring 27 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [2007/15] | Application number, filing date | 06020924.4 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | EP20050021853 | 05.10.2005 Original published format: EP 05021853 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772728 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1772728 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01N33/487, G01N27/416 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
G01N27/3274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Überprüfen von elektrochemischen Sensoren | [2007/15] | English: | Method and system for testing electrochemical sensors | [2007/15] | French: | Procédé et système destinés à la surveillance de capteurs électrochimiques | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 12.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2006 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | IE | 05.10.2014 | LU | 05.10.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 05.10.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 05.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 15.01.2014 | |
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9308477 (ROSEMOUNT ANALYTICAL INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 7 * * page 10, lines 5-17 *; | [X]US4822456 (BRYAN AVRON I [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 4 * * column 6, lines 13-52 *; | [X]WO0175438 (LIFESCAN INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 12, line 21 - page 13, line 28 *; | [DXA]US6733655 (DAVIES OLIVER W H [GB], et al) [DX] 1-9 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 15 * * column 2, line 35 - line 47 * * column 4, line 1 - line 17 * [A] 7; | [DX]US5352351 (WHITE BRADLEY E [US], et al) [DX] 1,4,7-9 * column 3, line 5 - line 20 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 41 * * column 6, line 26 - column 7, line 25 *; | [X]US6088608 (SCHULMAN JOSEPH H [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9 * column 10, line 37 - line 57 * * column 3, line 17 - line 22 * * column 6, line 17 - line 25 * * column 11, line 39 - column 12, line 49 *; | [X]EP1455182 (ARKRAY INC [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0027] , [0035] - [0050] *; | [X]EP1443322 (ARKRAY INC [JP]) [X] 1,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0010] , [0032] - [0040] - [0047] , [0048] *; | [A]WO2005078437 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO03095092 | WO2004113917 | US6733655 | US5352351 |