EP1908774 - Antibacterial and antiviral peptides from Actinomadura namibiensis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanofi-Aventis 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states sanofi-aventis 174, Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Bankmann, Michael, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Global Intellectual Property Department Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 703 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/15] | Bankmann, Michael, et al Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Industriepark Höchst Gebäude K 801 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06020980.6 | 06.10.2006 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1908774 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/36, C07K7/08, C12P21/02, A61P31/12, A61P31/04, A61K38/10 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
C07K14/36 (KR);
A61K38/10 (KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antibakterielle und antivirale Peptide aus Actinomadura namibiensis | [2008/15] | English: | Antibacterial and antiviral peptides from Actinomadura namibiensis | [2008/15] | French: | Peptides antibactériens et antiviraux isolées du Actinomadura namibiensis | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/38] | 22.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2008/38] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - MARAZZI ALESSANDRA ET AL, "Antibiotics GE23077, novel inhibitors of bacterial RNA polymerase II. Structure elucidation", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS (TOKYO), (200504), vol. 58, no. 4, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 260 - 267, XP002434109 [A] * abstract * | [A] - GOLDSTEIN B P ET AL, "A-40926 A NEW GLYCOPEPTIDE ANTIBIOTIC WITH ANTI-NEISSERIA ACTIVITY", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1987), vol. 31, no. 12, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1961 - 1966, XP002434110 [A] * abstract * |