EP1772267 - Cleaning apparatus for grippers of a transport system for printed products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neusser Druckerei und Verlag GmbH Moselstrasse 14 41464 Neuss / DE | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Rolf Alte Heerstrasse 22 41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Hund, Michael Goldregenweg 31 41468 Neuss / DE | 03 /
Paar, Andreas Xantener Strasse 13 41564 Kaarst / DE | 04 /
Hoppenkamps, Benedict Falkenstrasse 42 41065 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021114.1 | 09.10.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | DE20051048754 | 10.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005048754 | [2007/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772267 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772267 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
B65H29/003 (EP);
B41F35/00 (EP);
B65H2301/531 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reinigungsapparatur für Greifer eines Transporteursystems für Druckereiprodukte | [2007/15] | English: | Cleaning apparatus for grippers of a transport system for printed products | [2007/15] | French: | Appareil de nettoyage des pinces d'un système de transport des produits d'imprimerie | [2007/15] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3812678 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]); | [X]JP2001030472 (NIKKA KK) |