EP1849628 - Tire pressure detection side receiving circuit and tire monitor system provided therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100 Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken 503-8603 / JP | [2009/41] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100 Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi Gifu-ken 503-8606 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katou, Michiya c/o Pacific Industrial Co., Ltd. 100, Kyutoku-cho Ogaki-shi, Gifu-ken, 503-8603 / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021350.1 | 11.10.2006 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20060123645 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006123645 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1849628 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1849628 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | [2008/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849628 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/38] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1849628 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/04 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B60C23/0433 (EP,US);
B60C23/0408 (EP,US);
B60C23/0413 (EP,US);
B60C23/0442 (EP);
B60C23/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/30] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Empfangsschaltung für reifenseitige Druckerkennungsvorrichtung und Reifenüberwachungssystem | [2007/44] | English: | Tire pressure detection side receiving circuit and tire monitor system provided therewith | [2007/44] | French: | Circuit de réception pour appareil de détection de pression fixé sur la roue et système de surveillance de pneumatique | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 26.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005150286 (KURTZ ANTHONY D [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0017] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006079190 (OOBA TOMOTAKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] ** figures 4,8 * | by applicant | US2005150286 | US2006079190 |