EP1780447 - Control apparatus and method for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/18] | Control apparatus for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | ||
[2010/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JATCO Ltd 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Midori c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 02 /
Kodama, Yoshihisa c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 03 /
Ozone, Tatsuya c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 04 /
Iida, Toshiji c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 05 /
Shinohara, Fumito c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 06 /
Shibuya, Toshiyuki c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 07 /
Kobayashi, Atsufumi c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | 08 /
Kimura, Yusuke c/o JATCO LTD 700-1, Imaizumi Fuji-shi Shizuoka 417-8585 / JP | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06021471.5 | 12.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | JP20050317645 | 31.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005317645 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780447 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780447 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1780447 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/662 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F16H61/66259 (EP,US);
F16H61/04 (KR);
F16H61/00 (KR);
F16H9/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2011/09] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuergerät und Steuerverfahren für stufenloses Fahrzeuggetriebe | [2010/39] | English: | Control apparatus and method for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | [2010/39] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de commande pour transmission à variation continue de véhicule | [2010/39] |
Former [2007/18] | Steuergerät für stufenloses Fahrzeuggetriebe | ||
Former [2007/18] | Control apparatus for continuously-variable transmission of vehicle | ||
Former [2007/18] | Dispositif de commande pour transmission à variation continue de véhicule | Examination procedure | 05.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 20.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0140228 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,9 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 18 * * page 7, line 10 - line 14 *; | [A]US4536171 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,9* column 14, line 32 - column 15, line 62; figure 9B *; | [A]US4603602 (TANAKA YOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,9 * claims 6,7 * * column 1, line 35 - line 68 *; | [A]DE3634166 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 20, line 50 - column 21, line 62 * * column 17, line 44 - column 18, line 33 *; | [A]US4993284 (OSHIAGE KATSUNORI [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 44; figures 10,11 *; | [A]EP0899482 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0033]; figure 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0899486 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0010] * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE3844871 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 1,9 * column 9, line 16 - line 31; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1403570 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * paragraph [0058] * * figure 3 * |