blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1777389

EP1777389 - Use of a turbocompressor for obtaining energy from a gas under pressure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.06.2010
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.07.2010  [2010/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tentscher, Wolfgang
Karl-Stieler-Str. 3
12167 Berlin / DE
[2009/15]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
Eco Naturgas Handels GmbH
Karl-Stieler-Strasse 3
12167 Berlin / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Tentscher, Wolfgang Dr.
Karl-Stieler-Strasse 3
12167 Berlin / DE
 [2007/17]
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date06022092.820.10.2006
[2007/17]
Priority number, dateDE2005105057321.10.2005         Original published format: DE102005050573
[2007/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1777389
Date:25.04.2007
Language:DE
[2007/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1777389
Date:29.07.2009
[2009/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.2009
ClassificationIPC:F02C1/02, // F02C6/12
[2009/31]
CPC:
F02C6/12 (EP); F02C1/02 (EP); F05D2220/40 (EP);
F05D2230/52 (EP); F05D2240/40 (EP); Y02E20/14 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2007/17]F02C1/02
Designated contracting states[2010/14]
Former [2007/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwendung eines Turbokompressors zur Gewinnung von Energie aus einem unter Druck stehenden Gas[2007/17]
English:Use of a turbocompressor for obtaining energy from a gas under pressure[2007/17]
French:Utilisation d'un turbocompresseur pour récupérer de l'énergie à partir d'un gaz sous pression[2007/17]
Examination procedure30.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/30]
09.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2000229  (LUNDBERG R) [Y] 9-10,20-21,23 * abstract * * page 5, line 61 - page 8, line 21 * * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US4237693  (CORDELL GEOFFREY B [GB], et al) [X] 1,18-19,26 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - line 57 * * figure - *;
 [A]US4733528  (PINTO ALWYN [GB]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * figure - *;
 [XY]EP0563520  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [CH]) [X] 1-6,13-14,18,22,25-26 * abstract * * figure - * * column 2, line 9 - line 11 * * claim - * [Y] 7-12,15-17,20-21,23-24;
 [X]EP0801218  (FINMECCANICA SPA [IT]) [X] 1,18-19,26 * abstract * * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 50 * * figure - *;
 [A]EP1031803  (COMPRESSOR CONTROLS CORP [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * figure - ** paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0027] *;
 [Y]US2002163200  (OGLESBY KEITH ANDREW [US], et al) [Y] 17 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]EP1310644  (TUZOVA ALLA PAVLOVNA [RU]) [Y] 7-8,11-12,24 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0035] * * figure - *;
 [Y]EP1528237  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 15-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * figure - *;
 [A]US2005210878  (ASHIKIAN DANIEL [US]) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] * * figure - *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.