EP1785319 - Hinge for a vehicle flip-up hood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IAV GmbH Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr Carnotstrasse 1 10587 Berlin / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krause, Mathias Gutenfelsstrasse 2 13129 Berlin / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Buss, Fritz Gerd IAV GmbH Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr Kauffahrtei 25 09120 Chemnitz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Buss, Fritz Gerd IAV GmbH Ingenieurgesellschaft Auto und Verkehr Kauffahrtei 45 09120 Chemnitz / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022368.2 | 26.10.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051053307 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053307 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1785319 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/34 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B60R21/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Scharnier für eine anhebbare Fronthaube an einem Fahrzeug | [2007/20] | English: | Hinge for a vehicle flip-up hood | [2007/20] | French: | Charnière pour capot relevable de véhicule | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/40] | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/40] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10343077 (INNOTEC FORSCHUNGS & ENTW GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]WO2005044645 (CONTI TEMIC MICROELECTRONIC [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * |