EP1782675 - Hay-making machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): CH, GB, LI | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTH Landtechnik Hohenmölsen GmbH Grube Einheit 06679 Hohenmölsen / DE | [2008/02] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states Martin Ziegler GmbH & Co. KG Schrobenhausener Strasse 74 86554 Pöttmes / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daferner, Gerhard Immendorf Hs. Nr. 68 86554 Pöttmes / DE | 02 /
Frinzl, Richard Reichenberger Strasse 5 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Rapp, Bertram, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022473.0 | 27.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | DE20051053060 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053060 | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1782675 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1782675 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D78/10 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A01D78/1007 (EP);
A01D78/1014 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Heuwerbungsmaschine | [2007/19] | English: | Hay-making machine | [2007/19] | French: | Machine de fenaison | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 02.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2009
14.04.2009
ADMISSIBLE Niemeyer LM Industrie GmbH Hansestr. 1 48477 Hörstel-Riesenbeck / DE Opponent's representative Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, et al, et al Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.03.2009
Niemeyer LM Industrie GmbH Hansestr. 1 48477 Hörstel-Riesenbeck / DE Opponent's representative Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr., et al, et al Postfach 63 23 97013 Würzburg / DE | 17.04.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.09.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.11.2013 | 28.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.03.2014 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.03.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.06.2008 | CZ | 11.06.2008 | DK | 11.06.2008 | EE | 11.06.2008 | FI | 11.06.2008 | IE | 11.06.2008 | IT | 11.06.2008 | LT | 11.06.2008 | LV | 11.06.2008 | PL | 11.06.2008 | RO | 11.06.2008 | SI | 11.06.2008 | SK | 11.06.2008 | TR | 11.06.2008 | BG | 11.09.2008 | SE | 11.09.2008 | GR | 12.09.2008 | ES | 22.09.2008 | IS | 11.10.2008 | LU | 27.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | PT | 11.11.2008 | HU | 12.12.2008 | GB | 27.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/03] | CY | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
GR | 12.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CY | 11.06.2008 | |
CZ | 11.06.2008 | ||
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
TR | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
HU | 12.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
LU | 27.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
IT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
EE | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
IE | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
BG | 11.09.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
DK | 11.06.2008 | ||
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
RO | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
PT | 11.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SK | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
ES | 22.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 11.06.2008 | |
FI | 11.06.2008 | ||
LT | 11.06.2008 | ||
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
IS | 11.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
SE | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | FI | 11.06.2008 | |
LV | 11.06.2008 | ||
PL | 11.06.2008 | ||
SI | 11.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 11.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB956672 (FAHR AG MASCHF) [A] 1 * page 1, line 63 - page 1, line 88; figure 1 *; | [Y]US3896613 (VAN DER LELY ARY) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * column 2, line 13 - column 4, line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]EP0381970 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1* abstract *; | [Y]DE9114316U (H. NIEMEYER SOEHNE GMBH & CO KG, 4446 HOERSTEL, DE) [Y] 1-5,8,9 * page 13, line 10 - page 14, line 26; figures 11-13 *; | [X]DE9312222U (POETTINGER OHG ALOIS [AT]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * page 4, line 30 - page 6, line 33; figures 1,2 * |