EP1916884 - Circuit board unit and method for production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agie Charmilles SA Via dei Pioppi 2 6616 Losone / CH | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [2010/29] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states AGIE SA Via dei Pioppi 2 6616 Losone / CH | ||
For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bühler, Ernst Salita degli Orti 5 6616 Losone / CH | 02 /
D'Amario, Rino / 6806 Sigirino / CH | 03 /
Knaak, Reto via Collinetta 40 6612 Ascona / CH | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022498.7 | 27.10.2006 | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916884 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916884 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/02, H01L23/34 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
H01L23/3735 (EP,US);
B23H1/02 (EP,US);
B23H11/00 (EP,US);
H01L23/467 (EP,US);
H05K1/0206 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H05K1/0272 (EP,US);
H05K1/144 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0187 (EP,US);
H05K2201/043 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10166 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Leiterplatteneinheit und Verfahren zur Herstellung dazu | [2010/48] | English: | Circuit board unit and method for production thereof | [2008/18] | French: | Unité de carte de circuit imprimé et procédé de sa production | [2010/48] |
Former [2008/18] | Leiterplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung dazu | ||
Former [2008/18] | Panneau à circuit et procédé de sa production | Examination procedure | 17.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 13.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.2011 | BE | 06.04.2011 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | HU | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | IE | 27.10.2011 | LU | 27.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
LU | 27.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
IE | 27.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
BE | 06.04.2011 | ||
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 06.04.2011 | |
CY | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4835598 (HIGUCHI TOORU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9,13-15,25-29,31,32 * column 2, lines 35-66 * * column 3, lines 42-44 * * column 4, lines 8-14 * * column 5, lines 48-61 * * figures 5,8 * [Y] 8,30; | [Y]EP0408904 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [Y] 8,30 * column 4, line 25 - column 8, line 29; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE4240996 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9,26-32* the whole document *; | [A]WO9623397 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 10,17-22,33-36 * paragraph [0026]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2003010485 (GOLDMAN RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 11,12,16,23,24,37-55 * page 13; figure 6 * | by applicant | US4706164 | US4718163 | US4835598 | DE4012100 | DE4240996 | WO9623397 | US2003010485 | EP0844808 |