EP1919098 - Receiver apparatus and method for providing precoding information [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/19] | Receiver apparatus, transmitter apparatus and methods for providing precoding information | ||
[2009/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Tetsushi Mariannenstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022649.5 | 30.10.2006 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919098 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1919098 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04L25/03 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
H04L25/03343 (EP);
H04B7/0417 (EP);
H04B7/0634 (EP);
H04B7/0639 (EP);
H04B7/0641 (EP);
H04B7/065 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/03] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Empfänger und Verfahren zur Lieferung von Vorcodierungsinformation | [2009/09] | English: | Receiver apparatus and method for providing precoding information | [2009/09] | French: | Récepteur et procédé pour fournir une information de précodage | [2009/09] |
Former [2008/19] | Empfänger, Sender und Verfahren zur Lieferung von Vorcodierungsinformation | ||
Former [2008/19] | Receiver apparatus, transmitter apparatus and methods for providing precoding information | ||
Former [2008/19] | Récepteur, transmetteur et procédés pour fournir une information de précodage | Examination procedure | 23.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 11.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03069800 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0074] , [0086] , [0089] *; | [A]US2004174808 (BOLINTH EDGAR [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * figure 3 *; | [X]US2004252755 (JAFFE STEVEN T [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0076] , [0077] *; | [A]WO2006075220 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-30* paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * |