EP1783273 - Resin impregnated security paper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seidler, Rudolf, Dr. Finsterwalderstrasse 5 83703 Gmund / DE | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022667.7 | 30.10.2006 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | DE20051052672 | 04.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005052672 | [2007/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783273 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/40, // D21H19/82 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
D21H19/82 (EP);
D21H19/40 (EP);
D21H19/826 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Harzimprägniertes Sicherheitspapier. | [2007/19] | English: | Resin impregnated security paper | [2007/19] | French: | Papier de sécurité imprégné de résine | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/48] | 13.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO9628610 (PORTALS LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-25 * page 1, line 3 - line 9 ** page 2, line 3 - line 7 *; | [DA]US5660919 (VALLEE ANTOINE [FR], et al) [DA] 1-25 * abstract *; | [A]US6074742 (SMITH TAMMY LYNN [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO03087471 (HERCULES INC [US]) [DX] 1-3,14,15,21 * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 12 * * claims 1-35 *; | [DA]EP1099024 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-25 * claims 1-17 * |