Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1918751
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.11.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
18.12.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
27.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.08.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.05.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2009 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
16.02.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.12.2008 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
12.12.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] |
24.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.05.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.04.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
04.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
04.04.2008 |
First examination report |
|
01.04.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.07.2007 |
Amendment by applicant |
|