EP1780802 - X-ray radiation image detector based on amorphous selen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 2-26-30 Nishiazabu Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imai, Shinji FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2012/13] |
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
Imai, Shinji FUJIFILM Corporation 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022743.6 | 31.10.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | JP20050318155 | 01.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005318155 | JP20060224995 | 22.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006224995 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1780802 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1780802 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1780802 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/08, H01L31/0376, H01L31/0272, H01L31/115, G01T1/26, G01T1/29 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
G01T1/244 (EP,US);
G01T1/246 (EP,US);
H01L27/14676 (EP,US);
H01L31/02725 (EP,US);
H01L31/036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2008/31] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Röntgenstrahlungsbilddetektor basierend auf Selen | [2007/18] | English: | X-ray radiation image detector based on amorphous selen | [2007/18] | French: | Détecteur d'images à rayons X à base de sélénium amorphe | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 22.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5320927 (FENDER WILLIAM D [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,16,17 * column 4, lines 9-28 * * column 5, lines 9-24 *; | [A]US6171643 (POLISCHUK BRADLEY TRENT [CA], et al) [A] 1-31 * column 4, lines 11-24 * * column 5, lines 22-31 * * column 7, lines 13-28 * * column 8, line 18 - column 10, line 51 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2002329848 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 8,9,23,24 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0029] - [0074] - [0090]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 1,2,16,17; | [A]US2004104362 (IMAI SHINJI [JP]) [A] 1-31 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0010] - [0019] - [0039] * |