EP1803958 - Twin-clutch device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2009/25] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ieda, Yoshihisa Honda R&D Co.,Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Tomoda, Akihiko Honda R&D Co.,Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Kanno, Yoshihisa Honda R&D Co.,Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022855.8 | 02.11.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | JP20050377449 | 28.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005377449 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803958 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803958 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803958 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/10 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
F16D25/0638 (EP,US);
F16D21/06 (US);
F16D25/10 (EP);
F16D2021/0661 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2009/09] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkupplung | [2007/27] | English: | Twin-clutch device | [2007/27] | French: | Embrayage double | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 07.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08277852 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]EP1195537 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,2* figures 1,2 * |