EP1785508 - Method of manufacturing a photocatalytic active layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/20] | Method of manufacturing a photocatalyst active layer | ||
[2008/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2009/34] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Leopoldstrasse 252 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinrich, Peter Pestalozzistrasse 5 82110 Germering / DE | 02 /
Kreye, Heinrich, Prof. Dr. Werfelring 51 22175 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Schmidt, Tobias Isingheim 4 59889 Eslohe / DE | 04 /
Gärtner, Frank, Dr. Schiffbeker Weg 308 22043 Hamburg / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Patent und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Lindestrasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | ||
Former [2009/13] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Marken und Patente Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Kasseckert, Rainer Linde Aktiengesellschaft Marken und Patente Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022877.2 | 02.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051053263 | 08.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005053263 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785508 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785508 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785508 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/08 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
C23C24/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer photokatalytisch aktiven Schicht | [2007/20] | English: | Method of manufacturing a photocatalytic active layer | [2008/50] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'une couche photocatalytique | [2008/50] |
Former [2007/20] | Method of manufacturing a photocatalyst active layer | ||
Former [2007/20] | Méthode de fabrication d'un couche photocatalyseure | Examination procedure | 20.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.04.2009 | CZ | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | EE | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IE | 08.04.2009 | IT | 08.04.2009 | LT | 08.04.2009 | LV | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | PL | 08.04.2009 | RO | 08.04.2009 | SI | 08.04.2009 | SK | 08.04.2009 | TR | 08.04.2009 | BG | 08.07.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | ES | 19.07.2009 | IS | 08.08.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | HU | 09.10.2009 | AT | 02.11.2009 | LU | 02.11.2009 | BE | 30.11.2009 | FR | 30.11.2009 | MC | 30.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
HU | 09.10.2009 | ||
AT | 02.11.2009 | ||
LU | 02.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
AT | 02.11.2009 | ||
LU | 02.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
AT | 02.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/08] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
AT | 02.11.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
BE | 30.11.2009 | ||
FR | 30.11.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
MC | 30.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
BG | 08.07.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 08.04.2009 | |
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
EE | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
RO | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SK | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
IE | 08.04.2009 | ||
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | FI | 08.04.2009 | |
LT | 08.04.2009 | ||
LV | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
PL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SI | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
IS | 08.08.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1176227 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0014]; claims 1-5 *; | [PDA]DE102004038795 (BALLHORN REINHARD [DE]) [PDA] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X] - MORIMOTO J ET AL, "Improvement of solid cold sprayed TiO2-Zn coating with direct diode laser", VACUUM, PERGAMON PRESS, GB, (20040419), vol. 73, no. 3-4, ISSN 0042-207X, pages 527 - 532, XP002373228 [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vacuum.2003.12.157 | [DA] - C-J LI ET AL, "Formation of TiO2 photocatalyst through cold spraying", IEEE CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT TRANSPORTATION. ITSC PROCEEDINGS, XX, XX, (20040510), pages 1 - 5, XP008081175 [DA] 1-6 * the whole document * |