EP1785961 - Seat numbering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hiller Objektmöbel GmbH Kippenheimer Strasse 6 77971 Kippenheim / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Hiller Objektmöbel GmbH & Co. KG Kippenheimer Strasse 6 77971 Kippenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kopf, Günter Rosenstrasse 14 77971 Kippenheim / DE | 02 /
Dreher, Jürgen Tulpenweg 7 89188 Merklingen / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Matthias, et al Fischer & Konnerth Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Fischer, Matthias, et al Wiese Konnerth Fischer Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Schertlinstrasse 18 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Fischer, Matthias, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06022936.6 | 03.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | DE20051054398 | 15.11.2005 Original published format: DE102005054398 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785961 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785961 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G08B5/22, G08B25/08 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G08B5/221 (EP);
A47C1/124 (EP);
A47C1/13 (EP);
G08B25/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Sitzplatznummerierungssystem | [2007/20] | English: | Seat numbering system | [2007/20] | French: | Système de numérotage de places assises | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/07] | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 25.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4034154 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2287113 (BLACK NICOL JAMES [GB]) [X] 1-7 * page 1, line 2 - line 20 * * page 2, line 1 - line 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [E]DE202007012877U (KUSCH CO SITZMOEBEL [DE]) [E] 1-7* the whole document * | by applicant | DE10044589 |