Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008152537 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06023159 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1930031 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06023159 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101185765 | 28.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06023159 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2007136119 | 10.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06023159 | 07.11.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200708927 | 28.01.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | EP06023159 | 07.11.2006 |