EP1930031 - Method for sterilising the connection part of a bag-in-tank system and corresponding apparatus for sterilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | 25.12.2009 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INDAG Gesellschaft für Industriebedarf mbH & Co. Betriebs KG Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107 - 115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wild, Hans-Peter, Dr. Rudolf-Wild-Strasse 107-115 69214 Eppelheim / DE | 02 /
Tilz, Wolfgang Helmholtzstrasse 14 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023159.4 | 07.11.2006 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1930031 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/07, A61L2/18 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61L2/07 (EP,US);
A61L2/186 (EP,US);
A61L2/208 (EP,US);
A61L2/26 (EP,US);
A61L9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Extension states | AL | 07.07.2008 | BA | 07.07.2008 | HR | 07.07.2008 | MK | 07.07.2008 | RS | 07.07.2008 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sterilisieren des Anschlussbereichs eines Bag-in-Tank Systems sowie eine entsprechende Anlage zum Sterilisieren | [2008/24] | English: | Method for sterilising the connection part of a bag-in-tank system and corresponding apparatus for sterilisation | [2008/24] | French: | Méthode pour stériliser la pièce de raccordement d'un système de sac-dans-réservoir et l'appareil correspondant pour la stérilisation | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3502455 (NILGEN ELMAR [DE]) [X] 1 * page 22, paragraph 2; figure 17 * * page 15, paragraph 3 * [Y] 12,13; | [X]DE3825797 (ZEWATHENER GMBH SYSTEMVERPACKU [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 1, line 30 - column 2, line 3 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 17 *; | [XY]WO0134495 (FOOD SPECTRUM PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1,6,9-11 [Y] 4-6,8-10,12,13,18; | [XY]EP1369170 (HYNETICS LLC [US]) [X] 11-13,18 * paragraphs [0162] - [0184]; figure - * [Y] 8,18; | [Y]US2005072795 (ANDERSON IAN [AU]) [Y] 4-6,9,10* paragraphs [0005] , [0013] , [0041] - [0043] - [0069] - [0074]; figure - * |