EP1757745 - Corner connector for wooden elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taneichi, Kaoru 463-11 Aikoh Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06023414.3 | 13.10.2003 | [2007/09] | Priority number, date | JP20020336356 | 20.11.2002 Original published format: JP 2002336356 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757745 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26, F16B15/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
F16B15/0046 (EP,US);
F16B2200/67 (EP,US);
Y10S411/921 (EP,US);
Y10T403/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Title | German: | Eckverbinder für Holzelemente | [2007/09] | English: | Corner connector for wooden elements | [2007/09] | French: | Connecteur d'angle pour éléments en bois | [2007/09] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03256440.3 / EP1426509 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH250866 (KUEFFER ROBERT [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH302249 (KOEBERLE RICHARD [CH]) [A] 1* figures 10-12 *; | [X]US3305252 (JUREIT JOHN C) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 12-15; figures 2,4 * * column 2, lines 5-15 * * column 2, lines 58-61 * * column 3, lines 23-35 * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 6 * |