EP1791174 - Processes for regenerating layer transferred wafer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/22] | A process for regenerating layer transferred wafer and layer transferred wafer regenerated by the process | ||
[2018/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMCO CORPORATION 2-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okuda, Hidehiko c/o Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Endo, Akihiko c/o Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Kusaba, Tatsumi c/o Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2019/10] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
Okuda, Hidehiko Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Endo, Akihiko Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Kusaba, Tatsumi Sumco Corporation 2-1,Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2007/22] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023455.6 | 10.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | JP20050341397 | 28.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005341397 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1791174 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1791174 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1791174 | Date: | 06.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/762, H01L21/324, H01L21/302, H01L21/322, H01L21/304, H01L21/306 | [2018/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/3247 (EP,US);
H01L21/20 (KR);
H01L21/3225 (EP,US);
H01L21/76254 (EP,US);
H01L21/304 (EP,US);
H01L21/30625 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/22] | H01L21/762, H01L21/324, H01L21/302, H01L21/322 | ||
Former IPC [2007/22] | H01L21/762, H01L21/324, H01L21/302, H01L21/304 | Designated contracting states | FR [2019/10] |
Former [2009/06] | FR | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Regenerierung eines schichtübertragungswafers | [2019/10] | English: | Processes for regenerating layer transferred wafer | [2018/23] | French: | Procédés de régénération d'un substrat après transfert de couche | [2018/23] |
Former [2007/22] | Verfahren zur Regenerierung eines Schichtübertragenen Substrats und mittels dieses Verfahrens hergestelltes Schichtübertragenes Substrats | ||
Former [2007/22] | A process for regenerating layer transferred wafer and layer transferred wafer regenerated by the process | ||
Former [2007/22] | Procédé de régénération d'un substrat après transfert de couche et substrat après transfert de couche obtenu par le procédé de régénération | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 10.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0955671 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * column 10, paragraph 65 - column 11, paragraph 70 * * figure 2 *; | [A]EP1087041 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * page 6, paragraph 49 * * page 7, paragraph 68 * * page 10, paragraphs 93-103 *; | [A]US2001029072 (KUWAHARA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12* page 8, paragraph 128 *; | [XA]EP1156531 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-6,8-12 * column 7, paragraph 48 - column 8, paragraph 54 * * column 9, paragraph 57 - column 10, paragraph 68 * * figure 4 * [A] 2,7; | [A]US2003054641 (BINNS MARTIN JEFFREY [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 9, paragraph 71 - page 10, paragraph 73 * * claims 11,17 *; | [XA]US2005245048 (GRAF DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 12 * page 3, paragraph 40 - page 4, paragraph 46 * [A] 1-11 |