EP1755108 - Ring tone code structure and ring tone code reading apparatus for cellular phones [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muramatsu, Takeharu 1-16-11, Tsubakimori Chuo-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 260-0042 / JP | 02 /
Ishikawa, Hirokazu J Landcity 202 7-3-45,Saijo-chuo Higashihiroshima-shi Hiroshima 739-0025 / JP | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023470.5 | 15.07.2003 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | JP20020206736 | 16.07.2002 Original published format: JP 2002206736 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755108 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1755108 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/00, G06K19/06, // G06F21/00 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
G06K19/06037 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (KR);
G10H1/0058 (EP,US);
G10H2220/445 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] | Title | German: | Klingeltoncodeaufbau und Klingeltoncodelesegerät für Mobiltelefone | [2007/08] | English: | Ring tone code structure and ring tone code reading apparatus for cellular phones | [2007/08] | French: | Structure de code de sonnerie et appareil de lecture de code de sonnerie pour téléphone cellulaire | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 18.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03016077.4 / EP1383107 | Opposition(s) | 24.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2002125008 ; | [A]DE4107020 (FRANZIS VERLAG GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * column 3, lines 11-24,31-58; figure 2; claim 12 *; | [A]EP0984385 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0043] - [0058] - [0113] - [0119]; figures 1-22 *; | [A]US6267296 (OOSHIMA TADAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US6269446 (SCHUMACHER THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2002003886 (HILLEGASS JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0009] , [0036] - [0042]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]WO0241101 (NETCHARGE COM INC [US]) [A] 1-14* abstract * | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002125008 A 20020426 (SONY CORP) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0044] - [0046]; figures 1-3,10 * |