EP1786053 - Cathode catalyst for fuel cell, method of preparing same, and uses thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/41] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 673-7, Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alexandrovichserov, Alexey Leagal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co, LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Chan Leagal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co, LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kweon, Ho-Jin Leagal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co, LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | 04 /
Lee, Si-Hyun Leagal & IP Team Samsung SDI Co, LTD. 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu, Yongin-si, Kyunggi-do / KR | [2015/41] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
Alexandrovichserov, Alexey Leagal&IP Team Samsung SDI Co, Ltd 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwak, Chan Leagal&IP Team Samsung SDI Co, Ltd 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
03 /
Kweon, Ho-Jin Leagal&IP Team Samsung SDI Co, Ltd 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | |||
04 /
Lee, Si-Hyun Leagal&IP Team Samsung SDI Co, Ltd 428-5 Gongsae-dong Kiheung-gu Yongin-si Kyunggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Russell, Tim, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/30] | Sampson, Eimear, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2007/20] | Killin, Stephen James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06023487.9 | 10.11.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | KR20050107972 | 11.11.2005 Original published format: KR 20050107972 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1786053 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1786053 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786053 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/92, // H01M8/10, B01J27/057, H01M4/88, H01M8/22, H01M8/02, H01M4/86 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
H01M4/923 (EP,US);
B01J23/46 (KR);
B01J27/057 (KR);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
B01J27/0573 (EP,US);
H01M4/8807 (EP,US);
H01M4/8817 (EP,US);
H01M8/0245 (EP,US);
H01M8/1009 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | H01M4/92, H01M4/88, B01J27/057 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2015/41] |
Former [2009/40] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kathodenkatalysator für Brennstoffzelle, Herstellungsverfahren und Verwendungen davon | [2007/20] | English: | Cathode catalyst for fuel cell, method of preparing same, and uses thereof | [2007/20] | French: | Catalyseur catodique pour pile à combustible, procédé de préparation et ses utilisations | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 29.07.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 07.01.2016 | [2016/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19644628 (HAHN MEITNER INST BERLIN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * page 4, lines 33-49 *; | [Y]US2004096728 (CAMPBELL STEPHEN A [CA]) [Y] 5,6 * abstract ** page 3; examples 1,2 *; | [XY] - ALONSO-VANTE N ET AL, "The structure analysis of the active centers of Ru-containing electrocatalysts for the oxygen reduction. An in situ EXAFS study", ELECTROCHIMICA ACTA, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, GB, (20020830), vol. 47, no. 22-23, ISSN 0013-4686, pages 3807 - 3814, XP004378144 [X] 1,2,18-23 * abstract * * page 3807, column LEFT, line 1 - column RIGHT, line 10 * * page 3808, column LEFT, lines 33-39, paragraph 2.1 * * page 3809, paragraph 3.1; table 1 * [Y] 4-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0013-4686(02)00351-1 |