EP1795938 - Method and device for examining samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss MicroImaging GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Promenade 10 07745 Jena / DE | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Stefan Loderstrasse 3 07743 Jena / DE | 02 /
Simbürger, Eva, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 33 14482 Potsdam / DE | 03 /
Kempe, Michael, Dr. Am Mönchenberge 8 07751 Jena / DE | [2012/14] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
Wilhelm, Stefan Katharienstrasse 19 07743 Jena / DE | ||
02 /
Simbürger, Eva, Dr. Kopernikusstrasse 33 14482 Potsdam / DE | |||
03 /
Kempe, Michael, Dr. Am Mönchenberge 8 07751 Jena / DE | Representative(s) | Käckell, Peter, et al Geyer, Fehners & Partner (G.b.R.) Sellierstrasse 1 07745 Jena / DE | [2008/33] |
Former [2007/24] | Hampe, Holger Carl Zeiss Jena GmbH, Zentralbereich Recht und Patente, Patentabteilung 07740 Jena / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023598.3 | 14.11.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | DE20051059338 | 08.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005059338 | [2007/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1795938 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1795938 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1795938 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/00, G02B21/16, G01N21/64, G02B27/10, G02B27/14 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G02B21/0032 (EP,US);
G02B21/0076 (EP,US);
G02B21/008 (EP,US);
G02B21/16 (EP,US);
Y10S359/90 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | G02B21/00, G01N21/64, G02B27/10, G02B27/14 | ||
Former IPC [2007/24] | G02B21/00, G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Untersuchung von Proben | [2007/24] | English: | Method and device for examining samples | [2007/24] | French: | Procédé et agencement destinés à l'analyse d'échantillons | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 06.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.02.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2006 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | IT | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | ES | 05.08.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | IE | 14.11.2012 | LU | 14.11.2012 | AT | 30.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
LU | 14.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
AT | 30.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
IE | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
ES | 05.08.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
IT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0148803 (SFENA [FR], et al) [A] 27-31 * abstract *; | [A]US5105304 (TANAKA SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 27-31 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0548830 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [Y] 34,35 * abstract *; | [A]DE19829944 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19835070 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 34,35 * abstract *; | [Y]DE19835072 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 34,35 * abstract *; | [AY]WO0212863 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure - * * page 4, line 20 - page 6 * * page 8 - page 12 * [Y] 6,7,23-25; | [Y]US6396053 (YOKOI EIJI [JP]) [Y] 34,35 * abstract *; | [A]US2002109840 (WOLLESCHENSKY RALF [DE], et al) [A] 15-18 * figures 2-9 * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0059] *; | [XY]DE10137158 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 34,35; | [A]EP1308715 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 15-18 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]EP1396739 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 32,33* abstract *; | [XY]US2004218174 (NATORI YASUAKI [JP]) [X] 1-5,8-13,19-24,26,27,31,34-42 * figure - * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0115] * [Y] 6,7,23-25,32,33; | [XY]DE10339311 (LEICA MICROSYSTEMS [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,8-13,15-23,26 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0030] * [Y] 32,33; | [A]EP1591825 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [A] 27-31 * abstract * |