EP1801277 - Device for manufacturing a spacer fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Groz-Beckert KG Parkweg 2 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jürgens, Eric Frongrabenweg 14 72406 Bisingen / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023602.3 | 14.11.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | DE20051062403 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005062403 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801277 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801277 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D04B39/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
D04B9/06 (EP,US);
D04B15/16 (KR);
D04B1/22 (EP,US);
D04B15/00 (KR);
D04B15/02 (EP,US);
D04B9/42 (EP);
D10B2403/021 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, TR [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung eines Abstandsgestricks | [2007/26] | English: | Device for manufacturing a spacer fabric | [2007/26] | French: | Dispositif pour la production d'un tricot double parois | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/35] | 27.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 10.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2399002 (FRANKLIN COILE BENJAMIN) [X] 1-6,8,10-15,18,19 * the whole document *; | [X]CH618223 (NAGATA KNITTING MACH MFG) [X] 1-6,8,10-15,18,19 * page 3, column 2, line 9 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]FR2751351 (TEXTILES PLASTIQUES CHOMARAT [FR]) [A] 1,20* the whole document *; | [X]US2003089135 (SANGIACOMO FULVIO [IT]) [X] 1-6,8,10-15,18,19 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE10320533 (SIPRA PATENT BETEILIGUNG [DE]) [DA] 1,20 * the whole document * |