EP1755266 - Coding and decoding system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kikuchi, Yoshihiro c/o Toshiba Corp., Int.Prop.Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Toshiaki c/o Toshiba Corporation Int.Prop.Div, 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Dachiku, Kenshi c/p Toshiba Corp., Int.Prop.Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Chujoh, Takeshi 2-23-13, Hatsudai Shibuya-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Nagai, Takeshi 3-17-71, Akitsu-cho Higashi-Murayama-shi Tokyo-To / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
Kikuchi, Yoshihiro c/o Toshiba Corp., Int.Prop.Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Toshiaki c/o Toshiba Corporation Int.Prop.Div, 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Dachiku, Kenshi 101, Fare Toshiba 590, Unane Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Chujoh, Takeshi 2-23-13, Hatsudai Shibuya-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Nagai, Takeshi 3-17-71, Akitsu-cho Higashi-Murayama-shi Tokyo-To / JP | |||
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
Kikuchi, Yoshihiro c/o Toshiba Corp., Int.Prop.Div. 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Toshiaki 3-3-5, Shirayuri Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Dachiku, Kenshi 101, Fare Toshiba 590, Unane Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Chujoh, Takeshi 2-23-13, Hatsudai Shibuya-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Nagai, Takeshi 3-17-71, Akitsu-cho Higashi-Murayama-shi Tokyo-To / JP | |||
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
Kikuchi, Yoshihiro 604, Kureare Toshiba Yoshino-cho 1-10-1,Takasago Minami-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Toshiaki 3-3-5, Shirayuri Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Dachiku, Kenshi 101, Fare Toshiba 590, Unane Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Chujoh, Takeshi 2-23-13, Hatsudai Shibuya-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Nagai, Takeshi 3-17-71, Akitsu-cho Higashi-Murayama-shi Tokyo-To / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023634.6 | 18.03.1997 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | JP19960061450 | 18.03.1996 Original published format: JP 6145096 | JP19960163082 | 24.06.1996 Original published format: JP 16308296 | JP19960232362 | 02.09.1996 Original published format: JP 23236296 | JP19960243883 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: JP 24388396 | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755266 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1755266 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/08, H04N7/64, H04L1/00, H03M7/30, H04J3/06, H04N7/56 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04N7/56 (EP);
H03M13/00 (KR);
H04N21/43072 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/3027 (EP);
H04J3/0602 (EP);
H04J3/0605 (EP);
H04J3/07 (EP);
H04L1/004 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/0045 (EP);
H04L1/0075 (EP);
H04L1/0083 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP);
H04N19/68 (EP);
H04N19/89 (EP);
H04N21/234318 (EP);
H04N21/235 (EP);
H04N21/2383 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/08] | Title | German: | System zur Kodierung und Dekodierung | [2007/08] | English: | Coding and decoding system | [2007/08] | French: | Système de codage et décodage | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 09.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/04] | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/04] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97907355.8 / EP0886398 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0602621 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * * column 1, line 22 - column 7, line 28 * * column 11, line 46 - column 14, line 19 *; | [X] - WATANABE T ET AL, "ERROR RESILIENT LOW-BITRATE VIDEO CODING FOR MPEG4", DENSHI JOHO TSUSHIN GAKKAI GIJUTSU KUNKYU HOKOKU - IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, DENSHI JOHO TSUSHIN GAKKAI, TOKYO, JP, (19960314), vol. 95, ISSN 0913-5685, pages 37 - 44, XP008062488 [X] 1-11 * abstract * * page 38, column 1, line 1 - page 43, column 2, line 9 * * figures 1-4 * | [X] - CHUJOH T ET AL, "ERROR TOLERANT VERY LOW BITRATE VIDEO CODING (2) - DUPLICATE TRANSMISSION FOR IMPORTANT INFORMATION AND REVERSIBLE CODE -", ANNUAL MEETING OF IEICE, XX, XX, (19960311), vol. D-224, page 12, XP008062499 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - "FINAL TEXT FOR DIS 11172-1 (REV.2): INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY: CODING OF MOVING PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO FOR DIGITAL STORAGE MEDIA - PART 1 - CODING AT UP TO ABOUT 1.5 MBIT/S (ISO/IEC JTC 1/SC 29/WG 11 N 0156), PASSAGE TEXT", JA,TOKYO, ISO, (1992), pages 1 - 57, XP002034584 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | [X] - WAI-MAN LAM ET AL, "SELF-SYNCHRONIZING VARIABLE-LENGTH CODES FOR IMAGE TRANSMISSION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (19920323), vol. CONF. 17, ISBN 0-7803-0532-9, pages 477 - 480, XP000378972 [X] 1-11 * the whole document * |