Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7364372 | Global Dossier | 29.04.2008 | B2 | US2007117236 | 24.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005334303 | 18.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007142176 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005334303 | 18.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1788673 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005334303 | 18.11.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100456443C | 28.01.2009 | C | CN1967796 | 23.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005334303 | 18.11.2005 |