EP1923276 - Airbag module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guthke, Detlev Mauerstrasse 2 58089 Hagen / DE | 02 /
Maiwald, Helmut Zur Suelz 12 51515 Kuerten / DE | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023774.0 | 15.11.2006 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1923276 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1923276 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/217 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
B60R21/2171 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Title | German: | Luftsackmodul | [2008/21] | English: | Airbag module | [2008/21] | French: | Modul de sac gonflable | [2008/21] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2007 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.09.2008 | CZ | 10.09.2008 | DK | 10.09.2008 | EE | 10.09.2008 | FI | 10.09.2008 | IE | 10.09.2008 | LT | 10.09.2008 | LV | 10.09.2008 | NL | 10.09.2008 | PL | 10.09.2008 | RO | 10.09.2008 | SI | 10.09.2008 | SK | 10.09.2008 | TR | 10.09.2008 | AT | 15.11.2008 | LU | 15.11.2008 | BE | 30.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 10.12.2008 | SE | 10.12.2008 | GR | 11.12.2008 | ES | 21.12.2008 | IS | 10.01.2009 | PT | 10.02.2009 | HU | 11.03.2009 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | CY | 10.09.2008 | |
CZ | 10.09.2008 | ||
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
TR | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 15.11.2008 | ||
LU | 15.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
HU | 11.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 15.11.2008 | ||
LU | 15.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
PL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 15.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 15.11.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
SE | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
DK | 10.09.2008 | ||
EE | 10.09.2008 | ||
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BE | 30.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | CZ | 10.09.2008 | |
FI | 10.09.2008 | ||
IE | 10.09.2008 | ||
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
NL | 10.09.2008 | ||
RO | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
SK | 10.09.2008 | ||
BG | 10.12.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
IS | 10.01.2009 | ||
PT | 10.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
ES | 21.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 10.09.2008 | |
LT | 10.09.2008 | ||
LV | 10.09.2008 | ||
SI | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 10.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5611563 (OLSON BRENT K [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO03084784 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * page 14, line 18 - page 15, line 20; figures 3b,4,4a *; | [A]WO2005025947 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [A] 1 * page 7; figure 1 *; | [X]DE102004015753 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027]; figures 4-6 * |