EP1787763 - Electric power tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Hidenori Matsushita El. Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
Takeyama, Atsushi Matsushita El. Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2013/26] |
Former [2007/21] | 01 /
Shimizu, Hidenori Matsushita El. Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Takeyama, Atsushi Matsushita El. Works, Ltd. 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06023908.4 | 17.11.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | JP20050333284 | 17.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005333284 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1787763 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1787763 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787763 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B25F5/02, H01M2/10 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B25F5/00 (EP,US);
H01M50/213 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y10S439/929 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2008/30] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektrisch angetriebenes Werkzeug | [2007/21] | English: | Electric power tool | [2007/21] | French: | Outil électrique | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 14.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH08229852 (MAKITA CORP) [DA] 1-4* abstract *; | [A]EP1289032 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0011] - [0017]; figures 1,5 *; | [XA]US6955549 (BRAZELL KENNETH M [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * columns 2-7; figures 1,4,5 * [A] 3,4 | Examination | EP1726410 | by applicant | EP1726410 |