EP1764905 - Motor-driven power steering control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takatsuka, Yuji Mitsubishi Electric Contr.Softw.Co.,Ltd. 1-2, Hamayama-dori 6-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 652-0807 / JP | 02 /
Wada, Shunichi Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024185.8 | 23.01.1997 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1764905 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1764905 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P7/00, B62D5/04, B62D6/00 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
B62D5/049 (EP,US);
B62D5/0436 (EP,US);
B62D5/0484 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/12] | Title | German: | Steuerung für eine motorbetriebene Servolenkung | [2007/12] | English: | Motor-driven power steering control system | [2007/12] | French: | Contrôleur pour une direction assistée motorisée | [2007/12] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97900764.8 / EP0901217 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0536590 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 25 - column 8, line 45; figures 1-14 *; | [A]US5357181 (MUTOH NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 3, line 64 - column 10, line 46; figures 1-12 *; | [A]EP0706930 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 40 - column 14, line 41; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US5552684 (WADA SHUNICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* column 7, line 4 - column 13, line 34; figures 1-9 * | by applicant | JPH0891240 |