Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8838101 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2014 | B2 | US2011159872 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77665006 | 24.02.2006 | US201113041607 | 07.03.2011 | US41915306 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101026849 | 29.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US77665006 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7912468 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2011 | B2 | US2007201809 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77665006 | 24.02.2006 | US41915306 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1826992 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2009 | A3 | EP1826992 | 29.08.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US77665006 | 24.02.2006 | US41915306 | 18.05.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI371183B | 21.08.2012 | B | TW200803241 | 01.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US77665006 | 24.02.2006 | US41915306 | 18.05.2006 |