EP1927502 - Child vehicle safety seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2010 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433 Rui-Kwang Road Neihu Taipei / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433 Rui-Kwang Road Neihu Taipei / TW | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Wonderland Nurserygoods Co., Ltd. 10F, No. 433, Rui Kwang Road, Neihu Taipei / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Shun-Min 10F, No. 433, Rui Kwang Road Neihu, Tapei / TW | 02 /
Zhong, Zhi-Ren 10F, No. 433, Rui Kwang Road Neihu, Tapei / TW | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Rößler Heine PartG mbB Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Kahlhöfer, Hermann KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Karlstrasse 76 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024588.3 | 28.11.2006 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1927502 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1927502 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
B60N2/2824 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/07] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fahrzeugkindersicherheitssitz | [2008/23] | English: | Child vehicle safety seat | [2008/23] | French: | Siège-auto de sécurité pour enfant | [2008/23] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 25.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2001239868 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,8-11,17,18 * abstract *; | [XD]US2003020308 (PACELLA JONATHAN M [US], et al) [XD] 1-4,7,9-12,15-18 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005108155 (BRITAX EXCELSIOR, et al) [X] 1,2,5,9,10,17,18 * abstract * |