EP1798032 - Driving device for a printing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marneth, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Reinheimer Strasse 7 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 02 /
Püschel, Uwe Berndes-Allee 42 55262 Heidesheim / DE | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Bogen (IPB) Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024682.4 | 29.11.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | DE20051060294 | 16.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005060294 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798032 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1798032 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/00, B41F13/008, B41F31/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
B41F13/0008 (EP);
B41F13/008 (EP);
B41F31/004 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | B41F13/00 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/01] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antrieb für eine Druckmaschine | [2007/25] | English: | Driving device for a printing machine | [2007/25] | French: | Entraînement pour une machine d'impression | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005139102 (BAINTNER ALFONS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4241807 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4241807 | EP0834398 |