EP1795369 - Jam tolerant mail inserter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rozenfeld, Boris 48 Standish Road New Milford, Connecticut 06776 / US | 02 /
A. Salancy, William 20 Tod Road Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024713.7 | 29.11.2006 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | US20050301147 | 12.12.2005 Original published format: US 301147 | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1795369 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1795369 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B43M3/04 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
B43M3/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stautolerierende Kuvertiermaschine | [2007/24] | English: | Jam tolerant mail inserter | [2007/24] | French: | Machine d'insertion de courrier tolérante au bourrage | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4955185 (HAAS DAVE [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * column 4, line 26 - line 43 * * column 14, line 58 - column 16, line 56; figures 4-7, 15-17 * [Y] 2-4,6-7; | [YD]US6164046 (WERNER TODD C [US], et al) [YD] 2-4,6-7* column 5, paragraph 42 - column 10, paragraph 49; figures 1-7 * |