EP1792792 - Webbing take-up device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai-Rika-Denki-Seisakusho 260, Toyota-3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-0195 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOKAI-RIKA-DENKI-SEISAKUSHO 260, Toyota-3-chome Ohguchi-cho Niwa-gun, Aichi-ken 480-0195 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seiji, Hori Toyota Gosei Co., Ltd 1, Aza-Nagahata Ohaza-Ochiai Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/23] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06024855.6 | 30.11.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | JP20050345620 | 30.11.2005 Original published format: JP 2005345620 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1792792 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1792792 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60R22/44 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
B60R22/4628 (EP,US);
B60R22/4676 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/46] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gurtaufrollvorrichtung | [2007/23] | English: | Webbing take-up device | [2007/23] | French: | Enrouleur de ceinture de sécurité | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/10] | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002166914 (SPECHT MARTIN [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * paragraphs [0010] - [0012] - [0020] - [0022]; figures 3,4 *; | [X]GB2347122 (TAKATA [DE]) [X] 1 * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [X]EP1477377 (TOKAI RIKA CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2004256511 (KLINGAUF GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0028] , [0056]; figure 1 * |