EP1801911 - Antenna for motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jöris, Werner Pappelstrasse 12c 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 02 /
Mombächer, Hans Mainzer Strasse 71 55270 Schwabenheim / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Daniel, Ulrich W.P. Adam Opel AG, Patent- und Markenrecht A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2007/26] | Application number, filing date | 06024980.2 | 02.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | DE20051061861 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061861 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801911 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801911 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/00, H01Q1/32, H01Q1/08 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H01Q1/005 (EP);
H01Q1/085 (EP);
H01Q1/3275 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Antenne für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2007/26] | English: | Antenna for motor vehicle | [2007/26] | French: | Antenne pour véhicule automobile | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IE | 04.03.2009 | IT | 04.03.2009 | LT | 04.03.2009 | LV | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | PL | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | ES | 15.06.2009 | IS | 04.07.2009 | PT | 18.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | AT | 02.12.2009 | LU | 02.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
AT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LU | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
LU | 02.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 04.03.2009 | |
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE2846344 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 1 * * page 4, lines 15-20 * * figure 1 * [Y] 3-6; | [Y]US4435713 (GASPARAITIS BERNARD [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * abstract * * column 4, lines 12-45 *; | [A]EP0420567 (HARADA IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2,3 * abstract ** column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 50 *; | [A]JPH07193418 (HARADA IND CO LTD) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]US5917452 (HARADA JIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 9, lines 7-16 * |