EP1798735 - Method for as needed and anticipated handling and/or recycling of radioactive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/25] | Method and system for as needed and anticipated handling and/or recycling of radioactive material | ||
[2016/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westinghouse Electric Germany GmbH Dudenstrasse 44 68167 Mannheim / DE | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spicka, Michel, Dr. Bachgasse 32 69502 Hemsbach / DE | 02 /
Hermes, Torsten Kolpingstrasse 1 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2016/26] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
Spicka, Michel, Dr. Bachgasse 32 69502 Hemsbach / DE | ||
02 /
Hermes, Torsten Kolpingstrasse 1 68723 Shwetzingen / DE | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al C/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Bickert Postfach 1 12 67119 Altrip / DE | [2016/26] |
Former [2007/25] | Miller, Toivo, et al C/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Bickert Postfach 1 12 67119 Altrip / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025061.0 | 05.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | DE20051061106 | 19.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061106 | [2007/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1798735 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1798735 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/28, G21D1/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
G21D1/003 (EP);
G21F9/28 (EP);
Y02E30/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | G21D1/00, G21F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/26] |
Former [2007/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren für eine bedarfsgerechte und vorausschauende Handhabung und/oder Verwertung von strahlenbelastetem Material | [2016/07] | English: | Method for as needed and anticipated handling and/or recycling of radioactive material | [2016/10] | French: | Procédé permettant de prévoir un maniement et/ou une utilisation de matériau irradié conforme aux besoins | [2016/07] |
Former [2007/25] | Verfahren und System für eine bedarfsgerechte und vorausschauende Handhabung und/oder Verwertung von strahlenbelastetem Material | ||
Former [2007/25] | Method and system for as needed and anticipated handling and/or recycling of radioactive material | ||
Former [2007/25] | Procédé et système permettant de prévoir un maniement et/ou une utilisation de matériau irradié conforme aux besoins | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 10.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.10.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2006 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | ES | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | IT | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | NL | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | SE | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | AT | 05.12.2016 | GB | 05.12.2016 | IE | 05.12.2016 | LU | 05.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.12.2006 | |
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
AT | 05.12.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
GB | 05.12.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 05.12.2016 | ||
LU | 05.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
ES | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
IT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
NL | 29.06.2016 | ||
SE | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4437276 (VOEST ALPINE MACH CONST [AT]) [X] 1,11,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,12,13,15-24; | [XA]DE19824039 (NUKEM HANAU GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,15-24; | [XA]JPH04235400 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,14 * abstract * [A] 2-10,15-24; | [XA]EP0174797 (HYDRO NUCLEAR SERVICES [US]) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,15-24; | [XA]WO9523334 (BRITISH STEEL PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,14 * the whole document * [A] 2-10,15-24; | [A]EP0116663 (NTG NUKLEARTECH & PARTNER GMBH [DE]) [A] 11,12 * abstract *; | [A]EP0307271 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,14,16 * abstract * * column 1, line 1 - line 16 * | Examination | - ANONYMOUS, "Benutzerhandbuch FRM II", (20030530), pages 18 - 20, XP055100355 |