EP1862892 - Disk controller, channel interface and methods for use therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Flake, Lance, c/o Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine California 92618-7013 / US | 02 /
Mead, John P., c/o Broadcom Corporation 16215 Alton Parkway Irvine California 92618-7013 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Jehle, Volker Armin, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Jehle, Volker Armin Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf von Stosch, Jehle, Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025240.0 | 06.12.2006 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | US20060444821 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: US 444821 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1862892 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1862892 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
G06F3/0635 (EP,US);
G06F3/06 (KR);
G06F1/00 (KR);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0625 (EP,US);
G06F3/0634 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/06] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Plattensteuerung, Kanalschnittstelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Verwendung | [2007/49] | English: | Disk controller, channel interface and methods for use therewith | [2007/49] | French: | Contrôleur de disque, interface de canal et leurs procédés d'utilisation | [2007/49] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 30.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5829011 (GLOVER KERRY C [US]) [A] 4* column 5, lines 40-44 *; | [A]US6178056 (CLOKE ROBERT LESLIE [US], et al) [A] 2,7,9 * column 7, lines 3-19; figure 4 * * column 21, lines 28-33 *; | [X]US6580573 (HULL RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, lines 28-31; figure 1 * * column 4, line 61 - column 5, line 10 * * column 5, lines 29-50 * * column 6, lines 43-46 * * column 7, lines 30-58 * * column 9, lines 52-57 * |