EP1929937 - Device and method for investigating body fluids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstraße 124 4070 Basel / CH | For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
Roche Diagnostics GmbH Sandhofer Strasse 116 68305 Mannheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haar, Hans-Peter Waldstrasse 2 69168 Wiesloch / DE | 02 /
List, Hans Siegfriedstrasse 27 64754 Hesseneck-Kailbach / DE | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Pfiz, Thomas, et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025269.9 | 07.12.2006 | [2008/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929937 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150335 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150511 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/1513 (EP,US);
A61B5/15142 (EP,US);
A61B5/15151 (EP,US);
A61B5/15161 (EP,US);
A61B5/15176 (EP,US);
A61B5/15186 (EP,US);
A61B5/1519 (EP,US);
A61B5/15194 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | [2009/08] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Untersuchen von Körperflüssigkeiten | [2008/24] | English: | Device and method for investigating body fluids | [2008/24] | French: | Dispositif et méthode pour analyser des liquides organiques | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0199484 (AUDIO BIONICS INC [US]) [A] 1 * figure 9 * * column 15, line 21 - line 56 *; | [A]US4622974 (COLEMAN JERRY T [US], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003199893 (BOECKER DIRK [US], et al) [X] 14,15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0091] *; | [A]US2004133127 (ROE JEFFREY N [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004064636 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al) [X] 1-6,8-11 * figures 2-5 * * page 1, line 6 - line 8 * * page 9, line 21 - line 22 * * page 10, line 13 - line 18 * * page 12, line 5 - line 31 *; | [X]WO2004107970 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,12,17 * figures 1,2,3a,3b * * page 12, line 27 - line 29 * * page 13, line 25 - line 34 * * page 14, line 1 - line 2 *; | [A]US2005059166 (MARKES ROBERT [IL]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006229532 (WONG DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 7-9 * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0044] * |