EP1800529 - Mowing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Saulgau GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ober, Martin Buchenweg 12 78736 Epfendorf / DE | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Grosstobeler Strasse 39 88276 Ravensburg / Berg / DE | ||
Former [2009/43] | Eisele, Otten, Roth & Dobler Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Ravensburg/Berg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025318.4 | 07.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | DE20051061976 | 23.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061976 | [2007/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1800529 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1800529 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1800529 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/66 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A01D34/661 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Mähmaschine | [2007/26] | English: | Mowing machine | [2007/26] | French: | Faucheuse | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 05.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.08.2009
ADMISSIBLE Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 110 3147 PA MAASSLUIS / NL | [2009/38] | 24.09.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.02.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.08.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.09.2011 | 05.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.09.2011 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.09.2011 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 10.04.2012 | Fee for printing new specification paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.11.2008 | CZ | 12.11.2008 | EE | 12.11.2008 | FI | 12.11.2008 | IE | 12.11.2008 | IT | 12.11.2008 | LT | 12.11.2008 | LV | 12.11.2008 | PL | 12.11.2008 | RO | 12.11.2008 | SI | 12.11.2008 | SK | 12.11.2008 | TR | 12.11.2008 | LU | 07.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | BG | 12.02.2009 | SE | 12.02.2009 | GR | 13.02.2009 | ES | 23.02.2009 | IS | 12.03.2009 | PT | 13.04.2009 | HU | 13.05.2009 | GB | 07.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | [2015/29] |
Former [2012/50] | CY | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
GB | 07.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | CY | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
IT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | CY | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
GR | 13.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CY | 12.11.2008 | |
CZ | 12.11.2008 | ||
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
TR | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
HU | 13.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
LU | 07.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | CZ | 12.11.2008 | |
EE | 12.11.2008 | ||
FI | 12.11.2008 | ||
IE | 12.11.2008 | ||
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
RO | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
SK | 12.11.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 12.02.2009 | ||
SE | 12.02.2009 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
PT | 13.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | FI | 12.11.2008 | |
LT | 12.11.2008 | ||
LV | 12.11.2008 | ||
PL | 12.11.2008 | ||
SI | 12.11.2008 | ||
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
IS | 12.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 12.11.2008 | |
ES | 23.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 23.02.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1060650 (KUHN SA [FR]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0020] - [0031]; figure 2a * | Opposition | FR2160378 | US4185445 | DE19534695 | EP1060650 | EP1131992 | EP1350960 |