EP1933095 - Domestic appliance comprising a fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V. Belgicastraat 17 1930 Zaventem / BE | [2008/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hildner, Dietmar Espanstrasse 49 90765 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Schultes, Thilo Dalkingerstrasse 12 73463 Westhausen / DE | 03 /
Pörner, Harald Geisbühlstrasse 29 91220 Schnaittach / DE | 04 /
Walther, Christoph Feuchtwanger Strasse 15 91541 Rothenburg / DE | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Hochmuth, Jürgen Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development 90327 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/25] | Hochmuth, Jürgen AEG Hausgeräte GmbH, Patente, Marken & Lizenzen 90327 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025384.6 | 08.12.2006 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933095 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/32 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
F24C15/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/25] | Title | German: | Haushaltsgerät mit Ventilator | [2008/25] | English: | Domestic appliance comprising a fan | [2008/25] | French: | Appareil domestique comprenant un ventilateur | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/05] | 02.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB345006 (EDWIN JUELSON) [X] 1 * page 2, line 58 - line 62; figure - *; | [Y]GB1417333 (GLAVERBEL) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 99 - line 112 *; | [X]US4262183 (SMITH PETER H, et al) [X] 1,4,7 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 2; figure - *; | [X]GB2286455 (STOVES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,15 * page 6, line 28 - line 34 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 4; figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE4413252 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE])[A] 1; | [A]EP0833110 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6831255 (LEVI DAVID E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,15 * column 3, line 23 - line 33 * * column 4, line 4 - line 15; figure - *; | [Y]DE102004058390 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [Y] 19,20 * paragraphs [0007] , [0012] *; | [XY]WO2006122118 (ADAMSKI JOSEPH R [US]) [X] 1,2,4-18 * page 3, line 5 - line 17 * * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 16; figure - * [Y] 3,19,20 |