EP1933142 - Rapid immunochromatographic detection by amplification of the colloidal gold signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AraGen Biotechnology Co. Ltd. P.O. Box 94 11710 Naor / JO | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states The Jordanian Pharmaceutical Manufacturing Co. P.O.Box 94 11710 Naor / JO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Badwan, Adnan P. O. Box 851677 11185 Amman / JO | 02 /
Murshed, Abedel-qader Mohammed P. O. Box 20003 11118 Amman / JO | [2008/25] | Representative(s) | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/25] | Winkler, Andreas Fritz Ernst Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025525.4 | 11.12.2006 | [2008/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1933142 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1933142 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/558, G01N33/543, G01N33/58, C12Q1/68 | [2008/25] | CPC: |
G01N33/558 (EP);
G01N33/54388 (US);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
G01N33/54306 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IE [2009/18] |
Former [2009/09] | |||
Former [2008/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schnelle immunochromatographische Detektion durch Verstärkung des kolloidalen Gold Signals | [2008/25] | English: | Rapid immunochromatographic detection by amplification of the colloidal gold signal | [2008/25] | French: | Détection rapide immunochromatographique par amplification du signal d'or colloïdal | [2008/25] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2006 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 06.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.01.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 20.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 20.05.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.06.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.07.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 15.07.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees IE, DE | 16.03.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 16.03.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.04.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.03.2009 | 31.12.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IE | 11.12.2011 | [2012/47] | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0590695 (BUNCE ROGER A [GB], et al) [X] 9-11,25-27 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 44. * [A] 12-15,28-30; | [XA]GB2284479 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB]) [X] 9-11,25-27 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 1. * [A] 12-15,28-30; | [A]WO0246472 (NANOSPHERE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 25b. *; | [XA]WO2006039542 (QUIDEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 9-11,25-27 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 7. * [A] 12-15,28-30; | [A] - TANAKA R ET AL, "A novel enhancement assay for immunochromatographic test strips using gold nanoparticles.", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, (200608), vol. 385, no. 8, pages 1414 - 1420, XP002424110 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 4b. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-006-0549-4 | [A] - OKU Y ET AL, "Development of oligonucleotide lateral-flow immunoassay for multi-parameter detection", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (20011201), vol. 258, no. 1-2, pages 73 - 84, XP004311918 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-1759(01)00470-7 | [A] - SIMS P W ET AL, "IMMUNOPOLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION USING REAL-TIME POLYMERASE CHAIN REACTION FOR DETECTION", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (20000601), vol. 281, no. 2, pages 230 - 232, XP001147707 [A] 1-30 * the whole document * * in particular fig. 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.2000.4578 | Examination | - HAZARIKA P ET AL, "Sensitive detection of proteins using difunctional DNA-gold nanoparticles", SMALL, (2005), vol. 1, no. 8-9, pages 844 - 848, XP002407187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/smll.200500063 | by applicant | EP0590695 | GB2284479 | WO0246472 | WO2006039542 | - TANAKA, R. ET AL., "A novel enhancement assay for immunochromatographic test strips using gold nanoprticles", ANAL. BIOANAL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 385, pages 1414 - 1420 |