EP1798778 - Integrated thin-film solar cell and method of manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Guseong-dong, Yuseong-gu 305-701 Daejeon / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute of Science and Technology 373-1, Guseong-Dong, Yuseong-Gu 305-701 Daejeon / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lim, Koeng Su 122-1004 Hanbit Apt., 99 Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Seong Won 2-303- 84Siyeong Apt., 72-2 Bokhyeon-dong Buk-gu Daegu / KR | 03 /
Kwak, Joong Hwan 304-51 Banghak 2-dong Dobong-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Park, Sang II 805-1306 Gagyeong Dranchae 8-cha Apt., Gagyeong-do Heungdeok-gu Cheongju Chungcheongbuk-do / KR | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Jakelski, Joachim Jakelski & Althoff Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Jakelski, Joachim Otte & Jakelski, Patentanwaltskanzlei Mollenbachstrasse 37 71229 Leonberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06025934.8 | 14.12.2006 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | KR20050123337 | 14.12.2005 Original published format: KR 20050123337 | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798778 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1798778 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, H01L27/142 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01L31/046 (EP,US);
H01L31/0463 (EP,US);
H01L31/18 (KR);
H01L31/022466 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | H01L31/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Integrierte Dünnfilm-Solarzelle und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2007/25] | English: | Integrated thin-film solar cell and method of manufacturing the same | [2007/25] | French: | Capteur solaire à couche-mince intégré et procédé de fabrication de celui-ci | [2007/25] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/49] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XPL]KR20060100174 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [XP] 1-12 * figures 3-10 * [L] ; | WO2006107154 [ ] (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0072] - [0103]; figures 3-15 *; | [X]US5981864 (MIZUTANI MASAKI [JP], et al) [X] 17 * column 2, line 65 - column 6, line 2; figure 1D *; | [XA]JPS6135573 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 23 * figure 6 * [A] 18-22; | [A]WO03079448 (SCHEUTEN GLASGROEP BV [NL], et al) [A] 13-16 * the whole document * |